Clark County, Nevada v. Orbitz Worldwide, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Clark County, Nevada
Defendant: Orbitz Worldwide, LLC, Orbitz, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Travelscape, LLC, Travelocity, Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Expedia Global, LLC, Hotels.com, LP, Hotwire Inc., Booking Holdings Inc., Priceline.com, LLC, Travelweb, LLC, Travelnow.com, Inc., Agoda International USA LLC, Hotel Tonight, LLC and Hotel Tonight, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01328
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2021 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to #9 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Clark County, Nevada. (Dzarnoski, Mark)
August 25, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #9 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendants Agoda International USA LLC, Booking Holdings Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia Global, LLC, Expedia, Inc., Hotel Tonight, Inc., Hotel Tonight, LLC, Hotels.com, LP, Hotwire Inc., Orbitz Worldwide, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.com, LLC, Travelnow.com, Inc., Travelocity, Inc., Travelocity, Inc., Travelscape, LLC, Travelweb, LLC. Replies due by 9/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Bice, Todd)
August 13, 2021 Filing 10 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Clark County, Nevada. (Dzarnoski, Mark)
August 11, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Clark County, Nevada. Responses due by 8/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (Dzarnoski, Mark)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond Re: #1 Petition for Removal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/9/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 2, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Response to Complaint by Defendants Agoda International USA LLC, Booking Holdings Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia Global, LLC, Expedia, Inc., Hotel Tonight, Inc., Hotel Tonight, LLC, Hotels.com, LP, Hotwire Inc., Orbitz Worldwide, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.com, LLC, Travelnow.com, Inc., Travelocity, Inc., Travelocity, Inc., Travelscape, LLC, Travelweb, LLC. (Smith, Jordan)
July 29, 2021 Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Agoda International USA LLC, Booking Holdings Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia Global, LLC, Expedia, Inc., Hotel Tonight, Inc., Hotel Tonight, LLC, Hotels.com, LP, Hotwire Inc., Orbitz Worldwide, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.com, LLC, Travelnow.com, Inc., Travelocity, Inc., Travelocity, Inc., Travelscape, LLC, Travelweb, LLC. (Bice, Todd)
July 20, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Hotel Tonight, Inc., Hotel Tonight, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent AIRBNB, Inc. for Hotel Tonight, Inc., Hotel Tonight, LLC added. (Bice, Todd)
July 20, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Agoda International USA LLC, Booking Holdings Inc., Priceline.com, LLC, Travelweb, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Bice, Todd)
July 16, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia Global, LLC, Expedia, Inc., Hotels.com, LP, Hotwire Inc., Orbitz Worldwide, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Travelnow.com, Inc., Travelocity, Inc., Travelscape, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Bice, Todd)
July 14, 2021 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 7/14/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/29/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/13/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
July 14, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (HAM)
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-21-834681-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6556744) by Expedia Global, LLC, Travelscape, LLC, Travelnow.com, Inc., Orbitz Worldwide, LLC, Agoda International USA LLC, Travelweb, LLC, Hotwire Inc., Travelocity, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Cheap Tickets, Inc., Hotels.com, LP, Booking Holdings Inc., Hotel Tonight, Inc., Priceline.com, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Hotel Tonight, LLC, Expedia, Inc.. Proof of service due by 8/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bice, Todd) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark County, Nevada v. Orbitz Worldwide, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clark County, Nevada
Represented By: Alvin William Maupin
Represented By: Bert Wuester, Jr.
Represented By: Dominic P. Gentile
Represented By: Mark Dzarnoski
Represented By: Michael V Cristalli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orbitz Worldwide, LLC
Represented By: Todd L. Bice
Represented By: James J. Pisanelli
Represented By: Jordan T. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orbitz, LLC
Represented By: Todd L. Bice
Represented By: James J. Pisanelli
Represented By: Jordan T. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orbitz, Inc.
Represented By: Todd L. Bice
Represented By: James J. Pisanelli
Represented By: Jordan T. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelscape, LLC
Represented By: Todd L. Bice
Represented By: James J. Pisanelli
Represented By: Jordan T. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelocity, Inc.
Represented By: Todd L. Bice
Represented By: James J. Pisanelli
Represented By: Jordan T. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheap Tickets, Inc.
Represented By: Todd L. Bice
Represented By: James J. Pisanelli
Represented By: Jordan T. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expedia, Inc.
Represented By: Todd L. Bice
Represented By: James J. Pisanelli
Represented By: Jordan T. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expedia Global, LLC
Represented By: Todd L. Bice
Represented By: James J. Pisanelli
Represented By: Jordan T. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hotels.com, LP
Represented By: Todd L. Bice
Represented By: James J. Pisanelli
Represented By: Jordan T. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hotwire Inc.
Represented By: Todd L. Bice
Represented By: James J. Pisanelli
Represented By: Jordan T. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Booking Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Todd L. Bice
Represented By: James J. Pisanelli
Represented By: Jordan T. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priceline.com, LLC
Represented By: Todd L. Bice
Represented By: James J. Pisanelli
Represented By: Jordan T. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelweb, LLC
Represented By: Todd L. Bice
Represented By: James J. Pisanelli
Represented By: Jordan T. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelnow.com, Inc.
Represented By: Todd L. Bice
Represented By: James J. Pisanelli
Represented By: Jordan T. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agoda International USA LLC
Represented By: Todd L. Bice
Represented By: James J. Pisanelli
Represented By: Jordan T. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hotel Tonight, LLC
Represented By: Todd L. Bice
Represented By: James J. Pisanelli
Represented By: Jordan T. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hotel Tonight, Inc.
Represented By: Todd L. Bice
Represented By: James J. Pisanelli
Represented By: Jordan T. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?