Partie v. Ethicon Women's Health and Urology et al
Plaintiff: Norma Jean Partie
Defendant: Ethicon Women's Health and Urology, Ethicon, Inc, Gynecare and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 2:2021cv01366
Filed: July 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: James C Mahan
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2021 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to #9 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Ethicon, Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1) (McCoy, Robert)
September 7, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #9 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Norma Jean Partie. Replies due by 9/14/2021. (Nguyen, Mike)
September 2, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Anita Modak-Truran and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert R. McCoy (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6619305) by Defendants Ethicon Women's Health and Urology, Ethicon, Inc, Gynecare, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B Attachment) (McCoy, Robert)
August 23, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss #6 Amended Complaint by Defendants Ethicon, Inc, Johnson & Johnson. Responses due by 9/6/2021. (McCoy, Robert)
August 20, 2021 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT Concerning Removal by Defendants Ethicon, Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (McCoy, Robert)
August 20, 2021 Filing 7 First STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Norma Jean Partie. (Nguyen, Mike)
August 9, 2021 Filing 6 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Norma Jean Partie. No changes to parties. (Nguyen, Mike)
August 6, 2021 Filing 5 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Ethicon, Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Minute Order (ECF No. 3)) (McCoy, Robert)
July 26, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Ethicon, Inc, Johnson & Johnson. Responses due by 8/9/2021. (McCoy, Robert)
July 21, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 7/21/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/5/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/20/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 21, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ethicon, Inc, Johnson & Johnson that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Ethicon Women's Health and Urology, Other Affiliate Ethicon, Inc for Johnson & Johnson; Other Affiliate Gynecare for Ethicon, Inc added. (McCoy, Robert)
July 21, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (JQC)
July 20, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, District of Nevada, Case Number A-21-830270-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6565099) by Ethicon, Inc, Ethicon Women's Health and Urology, Gynecare, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit Ex B - Summonses) (McCoy, Robert) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Partie v. Ethicon Women's Health and Urology et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Jean Partie
Represented By: Mike Hieu Thien Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Women's Health and Urology
Represented By: Robert R. McCoy
Represented By: Sihomara L. Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc
Represented By: Robert R. McCoy
Represented By: Sihomara L. Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gynecare
Represented By: Robert R. McCoy
Represented By: Sihomara L. Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Robert R. McCoy
Represented By: Sihomara L. Graves
Represented By: Anita Modak-Truran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?