Carnes v. Golden Entertainment (NV), Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Akneeko Carnes
Defendant: Golden Entertainment (NV), Inc., Golden-PT's El Capitan 68 LLC, Gordon Borgwald and Gerald Cahoon
Case Number: 2:2021cv01409
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Stipulation Re: #1 Complaint. Golden Entertainment (NV), Inc. and Golden-PT's El Capitan 68 LLC's answers are due 10/7/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/24/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
September 23, 2021 Filing 13 Second STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Defendants Golden Entertainment (NV), Inc. and Golden-PT's El Capitan 68 LLC to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Complaint,, by Defendants Golden Entertainment (NV), Inc., Golden-PT's El Capitan 68 LLC. (Williams, Hilary)
September 17, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Akneeko Carnes re #4 Summons Issued. Gerald Cahoon served on 9/12/2021. (Lagomarsino, Andre)
September 16, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Akneeko Carnes re #4 Summons Issued. Gordon Borgwald served on 9/9/2021. (Lagomarsino, Andre)
September 3, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Akneeko Carnes as to Gordon Borgwald re #4 Summons Issued. (Lagomarsino, Andre)
September 3, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Akneeko Carnes as to Gerald Cahoon re #4 Summons Issued. (Lagomarsino, Andre)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Stipulation Re: #1 Complaint. Golden Entertainment (NV), Inc. and Golden-PT's El Capitan 68 LLC answer(s) due 9/23/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/23/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
August 20, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Defendants Golden Entertainment (NV) Inc and Golden-PT's El Capitan 68 LLC to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants Golden Entertainment (NV), Inc., Golden-PT's El Capitan 68 LLC. (Trimmer, Paul)
August 5, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Akneeko Carnes re #4 Summons Issued. Golden-PT's El Capitan 68 LLC served on 8/3/2021. (Lagomarsino, Andre)
August 5, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Akneeko Carnes re #4 Summons Issued. Golden Entertainment (NV), Inc. served on 8/3/2021. (Lagomarsino, Andre)
July 28, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Gordon Borgwald, Gerald Cahoon, Golden Entertainment (NV), Inc., and Golden-PT's El Capitan 68 LLC re #1 Complaint. (DRS)
July 28, 2021 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
July 28, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Akneeko Carnes. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Lagomarsino, Andre)
July 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6573968) by Akneeko Carnes. Proof of service due by 10/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons) (Lagomarsino, Andre) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 28, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (DRS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carnes v. Golden Entertainment (NV), Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Akneeko Carnes
Represented By: Andre M. Lagomarsino
Represented By: Cory Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Entertainment (NV), Inc.
Represented By: Hilary A. Williams
Represented By: Paul T. Trimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden-PT's El Capitan 68 LLC
Represented By: Hilary A. Williams
Represented By: Paul T. Trimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon Borgwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Cahoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?