Ostrander et al v. The Heights of Summerlin, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Ostrander and Denise Pauley
Defendant: The Heights of Summerlin, LLC, Summit Care, LLC, Latoya Davis, Andrew Reese, Genesis Healthcare, Inc. and Heights of Summerlin, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01418
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (HAM)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order; Discovery due by 5/2/2022. Motions due by 6/1/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/1/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/14/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
September 13, 2021 Filing 18 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Jacqueline Ostrander, Denise Pauley. (Davidson, Hunter)
September 9, 2021 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to #12 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs Jacqueline Ostrander, Denise Pauley. (Davidson, Hunter)
September 2, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #12 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendant The Heights of Summerlin, LLC. Replies due by 9/9/2021. (Christopher, Margaret)
August 27, 2021 Filing 15 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Latoya Davis, Genesis Healthcare, Inc., Andrew Reese, Summit Care, LLC, The Heights of Summerlin, LLC. (Christopher, Margaret)
August 26, 2021 Filing 14 JOINDER to #13 Reply to Response to #8 and #9 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Summit Care, LLC. (Christopher, Margaret) Modified on 8/30/2021 (EDS).
August 26, 2021 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to #8 and #9 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant The Heights of Summerlin, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DJM Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Email from May 17, 2021, #3 Exhibit C - Email from March 11, 2021, #4 Exhibit D - CC Declaration, #5 Exhibit E - Email Chain) (Christopher, Margaret) Modified to link to both motions to dismiss on 8/30/2021 (EDS).
August 19, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs Jacqueline Ostrander, Denise Pauley. Responses due by 9/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Davidson, Hunter)
August 19, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #9 Motion to Dismiss, #8 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Jacqueline Ostrander, Denise Pauley. Replies due by 8/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) (Davidson, Hunter)
August 10, 2021 Filing 10 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Latoya Davis, Genesis Healthcare, Inc., Andrew Reese, Summit Care, LLC, The Heights of Summerlin, LLC. (Christopher, Margaret)
August 5, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant The Heights of Summerlin, LLC., Latoya Davis and Andrew Reese. Responses due by 8/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Christopher, Margaret) Modified to add all filing parties on 8/5/2021 (DKJ).
August 5, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Summit Care, LLC. Responses due by 8/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Christopher, Margaret)
July 30, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/30/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/14/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/29/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
July 30, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (HAM)
July 29, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Summit Care, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Summit Care Parent, LLC for Summit Care, LLC added. (Christopher, Margaret)
July 29, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Genesis Healthcare, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Christopher, Margaret)
July 29, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by The Heights of Summerlin, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Christopher, Margaret)
July 29, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Andrew Reese. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Christopher, Margaret)
July 29, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Latoya Davis. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Christopher, Margaret)
July 29, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth District, Case Number A-21-837212-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6576373) by Andrew Reese, Summit Care, LLC, Latoya Davis, The Heights of Summerlin, LLC, Genesis Healthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W) (Christopher, Margaret) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ostrander et al v. The Heights of Summerlin, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Ostrander
Represented By: Jamie S Cogburn
Represented By: Hunter S. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Pauley
Represented By: Jamie S Cogburn
Represented By: Hunter S. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Heights of Summerlin, LLC
Represented By: Margaret Courtney Christopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Care, LLC
Represented By: Margaret Courtney Christopher
Represented By: David Mortensen
Represented By: Derek Linford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latoya Davis
Represented By: Margaret Courtney Christopher
Represented By: David Mortensen
Represented By: Derek Linford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Reese
Represented By: Margaret Courtney Christopher
Represented By: David Mortensen
Represented By: Derek Linford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesis Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Margaret Courtney Christopher
Represented By: David Mortensen
Represented By: Derek Linford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heights of Summerlin, LLC
Represented By: David Mortensen
Represented By: Derek Linford
Represented By: Margaret Courtney Christopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?