Mathews et al v. Equestrian Estates Homeowners Association
Plaintiff: Paul Frank Mathews and Maria Emilia Mathews
Defendant: Equestrian Estates Homeowners Association
Case Number: 2:2021cv01425
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE for #11 Certificate of Interested Parties, #12 Response. (MR)
September 7, 2021 Filing 14 Consent for Electronic Service of Documents by Plaintiff Paul Frank Mathews. (MR)
September 7, 2021 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to #10 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Equestrian Estates Homeowners Association. (Ayers, Michael)
August 30, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #10 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiffs Maria Emilia Mathews, Paul Frank Mathews. Replies due by 9/6/2021. (MR)
August 30, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Maria Emilia Mathews, Paul Frank Mathews. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (MR)
August 25, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Equestrian Estates Homeowners Association. Responses due by 9/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Photographs of Gate, #2 Exhibit Easement Map, #3 Exhibit Deed and Assessor's Parcel Inquiry, #4 Exhibit Amendment to Declaration of Restrictions) (Ayers, Michael)
August 16, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Equestrian Estates Homeowners Association. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ayers, Michael)
August 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael R. Ayers on behalf of Defendant Equestrian Estates Homeowners Association. (Ayers, Michael)
August 9, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul Frank Mathews, Maria Emilia Mathews re #1 Complaint, #5 Summons Issued. Equestrian Estates Homeowners Association served on 8/4/2021. (HAM)
August 6, 2021 Filing 6 Consent for Electronic Service of Documents by Plaintiff Maria Emilia Mathews. (MR)
August 2, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Equestrian Estates Homeowners Association re #1 Complaint. (MR)
July 30, 2021 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 30, 2021 Filing 3 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (Attachments: #1 Notice/Consent to Email) (MR)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Equestrian Estates Homeowners Association re #1 Complaint. (MR)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equesterian Estates Homeowners Association (Filing fee $402) by Paul Frank Mathews, Maria Emilia Mathews. Proof of service due by 10/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt No. NVLAS076654) (MR)
July 30, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (YAW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mathews et al v. Equestrian Estates Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Frank Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Emilia Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equestrian Estates Homeowners Association
Represented By: Clark V Vellis
Represented By: Michael R. Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?