Ramos et al v. Giltner Transportation, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Victoriano Ramos and Theresa Ramos
Defendant: Giltner Transportation, Inc., Giltner Logistics Services Inc., Giltner, Inc., Progressive Logistics, Inc. and Gary Robert Nair
Case Number: 2:2021cv01446
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #14 Stipulation without prejudice as to Defendant Gary Robert Nair. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/23/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) Modified Judge's signature date on 9/24/2021 (SLD).
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT GARY ROBERT NAIR ONLY by Defendants Giltner Logistics Services Inc., Giltner Transportation, Inc., Giltner, Inc.. (Hetey, Michael)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #10 Stipulation Re Consent to Electronic Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 8/24/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
August 23, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JQC)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #9 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 1/31/2022. Motions due by 3/2/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/1/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 8/23/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
August 23, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION Re Consent to Electronic Service and Proposed Order by Plaintiffs Theresa Ramos, Victoriano Ramos. (Goldstein, Peter)
August 20, 2021 Filing 9 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Theresa Ramos, Victoriano Ramos. (Goldstein, Peter)
August 4, 2021 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendants Giltner Logistics Services Inc., Giltner Transportation, Inc., Giltner, Inc.. (Hetey, Michael)
August 4, 2021 Filing 7 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Giltner Logistics Services Inc., Giltner Transportation, Inc., Giltner, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/18/2021.(Hetey, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 4, 2021 Filing 6 DECLARATION of DISCLOSURE STATEMEENT PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 7.1 AND L.R. 7.1.-1 re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendants Giltner Logistics Services Inc., Giltner Transportation, Inc., Giltner, Inc.. (Hetey, Michael)
August 4, 2021 Filing 5 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Giltner Logistics Services Inc., Giltner Transportation, Inc., Giltner, Inc.. (Hetey, Michael)
August 4, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by GILTNER LOGISTICS SERVICES INC., GILTNER TRANSPORTATION, INC., GILTNER, INC.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hetey, Michael)
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
August 4, 2021 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/4/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/19/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/3/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
August 4, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from DISTRICT COURT - CLARK COUNTY, NEVADA, Case Number A-21-834288-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6582206) by GILTNER LOGISTICS SERVICES INC., GILTNER, INC., GILTNER TRANSPORTATION, INC.. Proof of service due by 8/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hetey, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 4, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (JQC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramos et al v. Giltner Transportation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoriano Ramos
Represented By: Peter Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Ramos
Represented By: Peter Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giltner Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Harold J. Rosenthal
Represented By: Michael Hetey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giltner Logistics Services Inc.
Represented By: Harold J. Rosenthal
Represented By: Michael Hetey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giltner, Inc.
Represented By: Harold J. Rosenthal
Represented By: Michael Hetey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Robert Nair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?