Sykes v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department of Clark County Nevada et al
Plaintiff: Mark Clifford Sykes
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department of Clark County Nevada, Officer S. Hunt and Sheriff Joseph Lombardo
Case Number: 2:2021cv01479
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Richard F Boulware
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Mark Clifford Sykes. (DRS)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Denying #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis without prejudice. Payment of filing fees in full or a complete Application to Proceed IFP is due on or before 10/7/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 9/7/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, IFP forms enclosed. - DRS)
August 10, 2021 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (JQC)
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Mark Clifford Sykes. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (JQC) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/10/2021: #3 Summons) (JQC). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/10/2021: #4 USM285) (JQC).
August 6, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (YAW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sykes v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department of Clark County Nevada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Clifford Sykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department of Clark County Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer S. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Joseph Lombardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?