Glaspie et al v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Theodore Glaspie, Jr. and Patsy Glaspie
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc. and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01480
Filed: August 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
2 Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company, Corporate Parent C. R. Bard, Inc. for Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. added. (Swanis, Eric)
September 2, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/17/2021.(Swanis, Eric) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 11, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:21-cv-01480-APG-BNW. (no image attached) (DKJ) Modified text on 8/11/2021 (DKJ).
August 10, 2021 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 10, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (MR)
August 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Shreedhar R Patel to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 8/24/2021. (no image attached) (MR)
August 10, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Patsy Glaspie, Theodore Glaspie, Jr. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Muaina, Shaun)
August 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6589529) by Theodore Glaspie, Jr, Patsy Glaspie. Proof of service due by 11/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Muaina, Shaun) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 10, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glaspie et al v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Glaspie, Jr.
Represented By: Shaun Muaina
Represented By: Shreedhar R Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patsy Glaspie
Represented By: Shaun Muaina
Represented By: Shreedhar R Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Glenn F Meier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Glenn F Meier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?