Digital Verification Systems, LLC v. Trustifi, LLC
Plaintiff: Digital Verification Systems, LLC
Defendant: Trustifi, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01484
Filed: August 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Filing 9 AO 120 - REPORT on the determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (DRS)
September 9, 2021 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice. (DRS)
September 8, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Digital Verification Systems, LLC. without prejudice (Routsong, Keith)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 MOTION Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint: Trustifi, LLC answer due 10/4/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/30/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
August 28, 2021 Filing 6 UNOPPOSED MOTION Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Digital Verification Systems, LLC. (Routsong, Keith) Modified on 8/30/2021 to link document pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) (SLD).
August 19, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Digital Verification Systems, LLC. Trustifi, LLC served on 8/12/2021. (Routsong, Keith)
August 10, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Trustifi, LLC re #1 Complaint. (MR)
August 10, 2021 Filing 3 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (MR)
August 10, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Digital Verification Systems, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Patent Asset Management, LLC for Digital Verification Systems, LLC added. (Routsong, Keith)
August 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Trustifi, LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6590333) by Digital Verification Systems, LLC. Proof of service due by 11/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Summons) (Routsong, Keith) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 10, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Nature of Suit: 830/835 Patent Case (MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Digital Verification Systems, LLC v. Trustifi, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Digital Verification Systems, LLC
Represented By: Keith Routsong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustifi, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?