Seymour v. The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company
Plaintiff: RHONDA SEYMOUR
Defendant: THE WHITING-TURNER CONTRACTING COMP0ANY and The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv01486
Filed: August 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JQC)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #16 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 4/5/2022. Motions due by 5/5/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/6/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/5/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 4, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #14 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order for attorney Mark H. Hutchings, by Plaintiff Rhonda Seymour. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Hutchings, Mark)
October 4, 2021 Filing 16 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Rhonda Seymour. (Hutchings, Mark)
October 4, 2021 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #14 . Judge's signature block is on a separate page. Pursuant to LR IA 6-2: The signature block must not begin on a separate page. It must appear approximately 1 inch below the last typewritten matter on the right-hand side of the last page.Attorney Mark Hutchings is advised to file the corrected image using the event Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #14 . (no image attached) (SLD)
October 4, 2021 Filing 14 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Rhonda Seymour. (Hutchings, Mark)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation session. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 12/16/2021 at 09:00 AM in chambers of Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah, Room 4068. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 9/29/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #10 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Ronald W. Taylor and approving Designation of Local Counsel Richard T Creer. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/28/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 28, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to #7 Motion to Dismiss,, by Defendant The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company. (Creer, Richard)
September 28, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Ronald W. Taylor and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel R. Todd Creer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6646534) by Defendant The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company. (Creer, Richard)
September 21, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #7 Motion to Dismiss,, by Plaintiff Rhonda Seymour. Replies due by 9/28/2021. (Hutchings, Mark)
September 7, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Creer, Richard)
September 7, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company. Responses due by 9/21/2021. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Charge of Discrimination) (Creer, Richard) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Docket Correction to #5 filed by attorney Mark Hutchings. The Court has corrected and changed the event from Affidavit to Summons Returned Executed. No further action is required. Do not refile document. (no image attached) (SLD)
September 1, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed AFFIDAVIT of Service re #1 Complaint, #3 Summons Issued, by Plaintiff Rhonda Seymour. Defendant served on 8/18/20211. (Hutchings, Mark) Modified event on 9/1/2021 (SLD).
August 11, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (HAM)
August 11, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company re #1 Complaint (HAM)
August 11, 2021 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RHONDA SEYMOUR (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6590993) by RHONDA SEYMOUR. Proof of service due by 11/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Hutchings, Mark) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 11, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (HAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seymour v. The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RHONDA SEYMOUR
Represented By: Mark Hutchings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE WHITING-TURNER CONTRACTING COMP0ANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company
Represented By: Dare Heisterman
Represented By: Richard T Creer
Represented By: Ronald Wayne Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?