Bevan v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Richard Norman Bevan
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 2:2021cv01522
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sathya Oum on behalf of Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Oum, Sathya)
September 17, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #6 Summons Issued as to USA. USAO served on 9/15/2021. (MR)
September 7, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Certified Mail returned No. 7018 3090 0001 1133 2818 re #7 Notice of Certified Mail. (JQC)
August 25, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Certified Mail Receipts No. 7018 3090 0001 1133 2825 and No. 7018 3090 0001 1133 2818 re #6 Summons Issued as to USA by Richard Norman Bevan. (YAW)
August 25, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Commissioner of the Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General re #5 Complaint. (cc: copies of Complaint/Summons to SSA Commissioner, USAG via certified mail; Complaint/Summons to USA-NV via USM - YAW)
August 24, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi by Richard Norman Bevan. Proof of service due by 11/22/2021. (YAW)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is permitted to maintain this action to conclusion without the necessity of prepayment of any additional fees or costs or the giving of security therefor. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is kindly directed to file the complaint (ECF No. #1 -1). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is kindly directed to serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by sending a copy of the summons and complaint by certified mail to: Office of Regional Chief Counsel, Region IX, Social Security Administration, and the Attorney General of the United States. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is kindly directed to issue summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver the summons and Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 8/24/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Finance Dept. - YAW)
August 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (DKJ)
August 17, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (DKJ)
August 16, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Richard Norman Bevan. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kalagian, Marc)
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Richard Norman Bevan. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons). (Kalagian, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bevan v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Norman Bevan
Represented By: Marc V Kalagian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Sathya Oum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?