Li et al v. Lin
Plaintiff: Xiaolei Li and Yuezhou Han
Defendant: David S. Lin
Case Number: 2:2021cv01524
Filed: August 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 Filing 23 RESPONSE to #22 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Yuezhou Han, Xiaolei Li. Replies due by 10/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order) (HAM)
October 8, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss #8 Amended Complaint by Defendant David S. Lin. Responses due by 10/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (HAM)
September 21, 2021 Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/21/2021. ORDER. In light of the filing of the amended complaint #8 , which supersedes the original complaint and moots the motion to dismiss it #6 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion to dismiss the original complaint #6 is DENIED without prejudice, and the plaintiffs' motion for permission to re-file their response to the motion to dismiss #19 is denied as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT David S. Lin's Motion to Strike the Amended Complaint #18 is DENIED without prejudice to his ability to raise the arguments in that document in response to the amended complaint. In light of these rulings, the court sua sponte extends Lin's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint #8 to October 11, 2021. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAD)
September 17, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #18 Motion to Strike by Plaintiffs Yuezhou Han, Xiaolei Li. Replies due by 9/24/2021. (DRS)
September 17, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to RE-File re #14 Response to #6 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Yuezhou Han, Xiaolei Li. (DRS)
September 15, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Strike #8 Amended Complaint by Defendant David S. Lin. Responses due by 9/29/2021. (DRS)
September 15, 2021 Filing 17 Evidentiary Objections to the Documentation submitted by Plaintiff in the #14 Response (Objection) to #6 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant David S. Lin. (DRS)
September 15, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to #6 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant David S. Lin. (DRS)
September 11, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yuezhou Han re #8 Amended Complaint. David S. Lin served on 9/10/2021. (DRS)
September 9, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE (Opposition) to #6 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiffs Yuezhou Han, Xiaolei Li. Replies due by 9/16/2021. (Modified security to Case Participants only based on identifiable banking information. DRS)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting, subject to factors in the Order, the #11 Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically. Plaintiff(s) must file a certification that the CM/ECF tutorial has been completed on or before 10/5/2021. See order for additional detail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/9/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
September 9, 2021 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/9/2021. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #6 Motion to Dismiss. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 8, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically by Plaintiffs Yuezhou Han, Xiaolei Li. (DRS)
September 8, 2021 Filing 10 Consent for Electronic Service of Documents by Plaintiff Yuezhou Han. (Ad Hoc: QC - DRS)
September 8, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Plaintiffs Yuezhou Han, and Xiaolei Li. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (DRS)
September 8, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against David S. Lin by Xiaolei Li, Yuezhou Han. No changes to parties. (DRS)
September 7, 2021 Filing 7 Consent for Electronic Service of Documents by Defendant David S. Lin. (Ad Hoc: QC - DRS)
September 3, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant David S. Lin. Responses due by 9/17/2021. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/18/2021. (DRS) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 3, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by David S. Lin that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliates Zhenlong Li, Huiping Li, Zilian Bian for David S. Lin added. (DRS) Modified on 9/7/2021 (SLD).
August 30, 2021 Filing 4 ADVISORY LETTER to litigants. (DRS)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Each Plaintiff must file a certificate of interested parties no later than 9/13/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/30/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
August 17, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to David S. Lin. (DRS)
August 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David S. Lin (Filing fee $402) by Xiaolei Li, Yuezhou Han. Proof of service due by 11/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 NVLAS076957) (DRS)
August 17, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JQC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Li et al v. Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiaolei Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yuezhou Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David S. Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?