Ludwig v. State Farm Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Michael Ludwig
Defendant: State Farm Automobile Insurance Company and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv01527
Filed: August 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 Filing 7 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Temple, Marissa)
September 16, 2021 Filing 6 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Michael Ludwig. (Croteau, Roger)
September 1, 2021 Filing 5 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Temple, Marissa)
September 1, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/16/2021.(Temple, Marissa) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 17, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 8/17/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/1/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/16/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
August 17, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (YAW)
August 17, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by State Farm Automobile Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Temple, Marissa)
August 17, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-21-837694-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6598946) by State Farm Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Temple, Marissa) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ludwig v. State Farm Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ludwig
Represented By: Roger P. Croteau
Represented By: Kenneth L. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Marissa R Temple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Marissa R Temple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?