Armstrong v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Tod Armstrong
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 2:2021cv01534
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Filing 11 Certified Mail Return Receipt 7018 3090 0001 1133 1842 re #5 Complaint, #6 Summons Issued as to USA through Office of Attorney General. (DRS)
September 30, 2021 Filing 10 USM Return Executed re #5 Complaint, #6 Summons Issued as to USA. (DRS)
September 28, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Daniel P. Talbert on behalf of Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Talbert, Daniel)
September 28, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE Certified Mail Returned 7018 3090 0001 1133 1835 re #7 Certified Mail. (JQC)
September 20, 2021 Filing 7 Certified Mail Receipts 7018 3090 0001 1133 1842 and 7018 3090 0001 1133 1835 re #5 Complaint, #6 Summons Issued as to USA. (DRS)
September 20, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (cc: USMS - DRS)
September 17, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi by Tod Armstrong. (DRS) (Main Document 5 replaced and NEF regenerated on 9/20/2021) (DRS).
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court shall file the Complaint and serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by sending a copy of the summons and Complaint by certified mail. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver the summons and Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 9/17/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF. cc: USM - DRS)
August 18, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (SLD)
August 18, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (SLD)
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Tod Armstrong. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kalagian, Marc)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Tod Armstrong. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Kalagian, Marc) Modified on 8/19/2021 (SLD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armstrong v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tod Armstrong
Represented By: Marc V Kalagian
Represented By: Leonard Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Daniel P. Talbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?