NRT Technology Corp. v. Las Vegas Sands Corp.
Plaintiff: NRT Technology Corp.
Defendant: Las Vegas Sands Corp.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01570
Filed: August 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: James C Mahan
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/20/2021. By Judicial Assistant: E. Santiago. RE: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony by The Las Vegas Sands Corp. (ECF Nos. 1, 2) and Defendant's Counter Motion to Quash Subpoenas (ECF No. 16). Motion Hearing set for Thursday, October 28, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting #19 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/18/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting #5 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/18/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 14, 2021 Filing 22 RESPONSE to #16 Motion to Quash by Plaintiff NRT Technology Corp.. Replies due by 9/21/2021. (Johnson, H.)
September 14, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #17 Reply by Plaintiff NRT Technology Corp.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Johnson, H.)
September 14, 2021 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #17 . Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(b). For each type of relief requested or purpose, a separate document must be filed. Counsel is advised to refile the Response to #16 Motion to Quash located in ECF No. #17 as a separate entry to be in compliance with LR IC 2-2(b) and LR IC 2-2(c) by filing two separate documents for each request or purpose. DO NOT refile the reply to #1 Motion to Compel. (no image attached) (DKJ)
September 13, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Seal #17 Reply by Plaintiff NRT Technology Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Johnson, H.)
September 13, 2021 Filing 17 VIEW #21 corrected image re REPLY to Response to #1 Motion, by Plaintiff NRT Technology Corp.. (Johnson, H.) Modified link on 9/14/2021 (DKJ).
September 8, 2021 Filing 16 Counter MOTION to Quash Subpoenas re 15 QC Notice, by Defendant Las Vegas Sands Corp.. (Rulis, Nathanael)
September 8, 2021 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #14 Response. Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(b). For each type of relief requested or purpose, a separate document must be filed. Counsel is advised to refile the Countermotion contained in ECF No. #14 and be in compliance with LR IC 2-2(b) and LR IC 2-2(c) by filing two separate documents for each request or purpose. (no image attached) (EDS)
September 7, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #1 Motion by Defendant Las Vegas Sands Corp.. Replies due by 9/14/2021. (Rulis, Nathanael)
August 25, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #12 Declaration by Plaintiff NRT Technology Corp.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Johnson, H.)
August 25, 2021 Filing 12 VIEW #13 corrected image re summons returned Executed re #1 Motion to Compel by Plaintiff NRT Technology Corp.. (Johnson, H.) Modified text and link on 8/25/2021 (DKJ).
August 24, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Las Vegas Sands Corp.. (JQC)
August 24, 2021 Filing 10 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff NRT Technology Corp.. (Johnson, H.)
August 24, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE that this case, formerly Misc. Case No. 2:21-ms-00061, having become a contested proceeding on 8/24/21, has been converted to the regular civil docket and has been assigned case number 2:21-cv-01570. All future pleadings must be filed in the civil action and must bear said civil case number. (JQC)
August 24, 2021 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Mitchell D. Raup re #1 Motion by Plaintiff NRT Technology Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit) (Johnson, H.)
August 24, 2021 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff NRT Technology Corp.. (Johnson, H.)
August 24, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #1 Motion. ERROR: Case opened without the attorney paying the required filing fee. Attorney H. Johnson advised to pay the required filing fee. (no image attached) (DKJ)
August 24, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (JQC)
August 23, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Seal by Plaintiff NRT Technology Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Johnson, H.)
August 23, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET to #1 Motion by Plaintiff NRT Technology Corp.. (Johnson, H.)
August 23, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony by the Las Vegas Sands Corp. by Plaintiff NRT Technology Corp.. Responses due by 9/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Johnson, H.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NRT Technology Corp. v. Las Vegas Sands Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NRT Technology Corp.
Represented By: H. Stan Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Sands Corp.
Represented By: Nathanael R Rulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?