Neville v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Christina Marie Neville
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 2:2021cv01573
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Allison Cheung on behalf of Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Cheung, Allison)
September 17, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #6 Summons Issued as to USA. USAO served on 9/15/2021. (MR)
September 13, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Certified Mail Return Receipt to the US Attorney General re #5 Complaint and #6 Summons Issued as to USA. (HAM)
September 7, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Certified Mail Return Receipt to the Social Security Administration re #5 Complaint and #6 Summons. (HAM)
August 31, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Certified Mail Receipts to Social Security Admin. and US Attorney General re #5 Complaint and #6 Summons Issued as to USA. (HAM)
August 31, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General re #5 Complaint. (certified mail to Social Security Admin. and US Attorney General, and by email to USM for service on US Attorney for the District of Nevada along with #5 complaint - HAM)
August 31, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi by Christina Marie Neville. Proof of service due by 11/29/2021. (HAM)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCREENING ORDER and ORDER granting #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.The Clerk of Court shall file the Complaint. The Clerk of Court shall serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by sending a copy of the summons and Complaint by certified mail (see Order for details).The Clerk of Court shall issue summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver the summons and Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/31/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 24, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (SLD)
August 24, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (SLD)
August 24, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Christina Marie Neville. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kalagian, Marc)
August 24, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Christina Marie Neville. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Kalagian, Marc) Modified on 8/25/2021 (SLD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neville v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Marie Neville
Represented By: Marc V Kalagian
Represented By: Leonard Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Allison Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?