Smith-Grube v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Sherry Lynn Smith-Grube
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration and Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 2:2021cv01574
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sherry Lynn Smith-Grube re #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,,. Kilolo Kijakazi served on 9/21/2021. (Barrett, Mark)
September 28, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Daniel P. Talbert on behalf of Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Talbert, Daniel)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark D. Barrett for Sherry Lynn Smith-Grube and approving Designation of Local Counsel Hal Taylor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 8/31/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
August 26, 2021 Filing 5 First MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Mark D. Barrett and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Hal Taylor (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6610632) by Plaintiff Sherry Lynn Smith-Grube. (Taylor, Hal)
August 25, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration re #1 Complaint. (DRS)
August 25, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (DRS)
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Sherry Lynn Smith-Grube. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Taylor, Hal)
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6609502) by Sherry Lynn Smith-Grube. Proof of service due by 11/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CCS, #2 Summons OGC, #3 Summons USAG, #4 Summons USAO) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 8/25/2021 (DRS).
August 25, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (DRS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith-Grube v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Lynn Smith-Grube
Represented By: Mark D. Barrett
Represented By: Hal Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Daniel P. Talbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?