Payne v. BP Solutions LLC et al
Plaintiff: Chase Payne
Defendant: BP Solutions LLC and Ayr Wellness Holdings LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01578
Filed: August 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Stipulation Re: #1 Petition for Removal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 9/29/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
September 28, 2021 Filing 10 Second STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) to Respond to Complaint re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendants Ayr Wellness Holdings LLC, BP Solutions LLC. (Durham, Matthew)
September 24, 2021 Filing 9 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Ayr Wellness Holdings LLC, BP Solutions LLC. (Durham, Matthew)
August 31, 2021 Filing 8 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Ayr Wellness Holdings LLC, BP Solutions LLC. (Durham, Matthew)
August 31, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ayr Wellness Holdings LLC, BP Solutions LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Ayr Wellness Inc. for Ayr Wellness Holdings LLC; Corporate Parent CSAC-Livfree LLC for BP Solutions LLC added. (Durham, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Stipulation Re: #1 Petition for Removal. Ayr Wellness Holdings LLC answer due 10/1/2021; BP Solutions LLC answer due 10/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 8/30/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 27, 2021 Filing 5 First STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendants Ayr Wellness Holdings LLC, BP Solutions LLC. (Durham, Matthew)
August 26, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Chase Payne. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gabroy, Christian)
August 26, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/26/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/10/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/25/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 26, 2021 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 26, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court of Nevada, Case Number A-21-838212-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6610789) by Ayr Wellness Holdings LLC, BP Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Durham, Matthew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 26, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (HAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payne v. BP Solutions LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chase Payne
Represented By: Christian James Gabroy
Represented By: Kaine M. Messer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Solutions LLC
Represented By: Matthew L. Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ayr Wellness Holdings LLC
Represented By: Matthew L. Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?