Bartlett v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Rodney Levett Bartlett
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 2:2021cv01579
Filed: August 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Daniel P. Talbert on behalf of Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Talbert, Daniel)
September 17, 2021 Filing 9 USM Return Executed re #5 Complaint, #6 Summons Issued as to USA. (DRS)
September 14, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPTS 7018 3090 0001 1133 1613 re #5 Complaint, #6 Summons Issued as to USA. (DRS)
August 31, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPTS 7018 3090 0001 1133 1613 AND 7018 3090 0001 1133 1620 re #6 Summons Issued as to USA. (DRS)
August 31, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (cc: USM - DRS)
August 31, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT by Rodney Levett Bartlett. (DRS)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court shall file the Complaint and serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by sending a copy of the summons and Complaint by certified mail. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver the summons and Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/31/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: USMS - DRS)
August 27, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (EDS)
August 27, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (EDS)
August 26, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Rodney Levett Bartlett. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kalagian, Marc)
August 26, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Rodney Levett Bartlett. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Kalagian, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bartlett v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Levett Bartlett
Represented By: Marc V Kalagian
Represented By: Leonard Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Daniel P. Talbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?