Kramer v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Audrey E Kramer
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A., Kent F. Larsen and Smith Larsen & Wixom
Case Number: 2:2021cv01585
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 pp
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to #29 Motion to Stay Discovery by Defendants Kent F. Larsen, Smith Larsen & Wixom. (Attachments: #1 Index Index, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D) (Cwik, Marc)
October 18, 2021 Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/18/2021. Regarding ECF Nos. #32 and #33 : Motion hearing is set for 11/23/2021 at 2:00 p.m. in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. This means that the Court will hear arguments on ECF Nos. #29 , #32 , and #33 at this hearing. The Court strongly encourages parties to participate in person for these proceedings. For any party who still may require participation via Zoom videoconference, please contact this Court's Courtroom Administrator Jeff Miller at jeff_miller@nvd.uscourts.gov no later than one business day and no sooner than one week prior to the hearing to make suitable arrangements. To appear telephonically, parties must call, five minutes prior to the hearing, (877) 810-9415 and enter access code 2365998.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RA)
October 15, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION for Request for Judicial Notice, by Plaintiff Audrey E Kramer. Responses due by 10/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Volume 1, #2 Exhibit Volume 2, #3 Exhibit Volume 3) (MR)
October 15, 2021 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Conduct Discovery, by Plaintiff Audrey E Kramer. Responses due by 10/29/2021. (MR)
October 15, 2021 Filing 31 RESPONSE to #29 Motion to Stay Discovery, by Plaintiff Audrey E Kramer. Replies due by 10/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Receipt/Proof of Delivery) (MR)
October 1, 2021 Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/1/2021. Regarding ECF No. #29 Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery: Motion hearing is set for 11/23/2021 at 2:00 p.m. in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. Parties may appear in person, telephonically, or via Zoom. To appear telephonically, parties must call, five minutes prior to the hearing, (877) 810-9415 and enter access code 2365998. To receive a Zoom invitation, counsel or the parties must contact courtroom administrator Jeff Miller at jeff_miller@nvd.uscourts.gov no later than noon on the day prior to the hearing and no sooner than one week prior to the hearing.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RA)
September 30, 2021 Filing 29 RENEWED MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Outcome of #5 and #12 Motions, by Defendants Kent F. Larsen, Smith Larsen & Wixom. (Cwik, Marc) Modified on 9/30/2021 to link document to Motions (SLD).
September 10, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sean K. McElenney on behalf of Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.. (McElenney, Sean)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Denying without prejudice #26 Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 9/10/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 9, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendants Kent F. Larsen, Smith Larsen & Wixom. (Cwik, Marc)
September 9, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 3:18-cv-00001 by Defendants Kent F. Larsen, Smith Larsen & Wixom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Cwik, Marc)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting #23 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 9/9/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 8, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Marc S. Cwik in for Attorney Alex A. Graft and Kendall A. Layne by Defendants Kent F. Larsen, Smith Larsen & Wixom. (Cwik, Marc)
August 27, 2021 Filing 22 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
August 27, 2021 Filing 21 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:21-cv-04266. Original file with transfer order and docket sheet received. (JQC)
August 27, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (JQC)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #5 MOTION TO DISMISS AND #12 MOTION TO TRANSFER OR, ALTERNATIVELY, DISMISS by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/27/2021.]
August 26, 2021 Filing 19 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Webb, Kristin) (Filed on 8/26/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/27/2021.]
August 25, 2021 Filing 18 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Kramer, Audrey) (Filed on 8/25/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/27/2021.]
August 25, 2021 Filing 17 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Layne, Kendall) (Filed on 8/25/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/27/2021.]
August 24, 2021 Filing 16 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #12 MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of Nevada, or Dismiss for Improper Venue, Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, or Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Could be Granted ) filed byAudrey E Kramer. (Attachments: #1 PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBITS A-E, #2 PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT F, #3 PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBITS G-J)(Kramer, Audrey) (Filed on 8/24/2021) Modified on 8/25/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/27/2021.]
August 11, 2021 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Webb, Kristin) (Filed on 8/11/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/27/2021.]
August 11, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted, i.e. JPMorgan Chase & Co.. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affi liates or corporate parents re #14 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/27/2021.]
August 10, 2021 Filing 14 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT NO. #15 *** Certificate of Interested Entities by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Webb, Kristin) (Filed on 8/10/2021) Modified on 8/12/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/27/2021.]
August 10, 2021 Filing 13 Proposed Order re #12 Motion to Transfer by Kent F. Larsen, Smith Larsen & Wixom. (Layne, Kendall) (Filed on 8/10/2021) Modified on 8/11/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/27/2021.]
August 10, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of Nevada, or Dismiss for Improper Venue, Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, or Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Could be Granted filed by Kent F. Larsen, Smith Larsen & Wixom. Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 8/24/2021. Replies due by 8/31/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appearance by Kendal A. Layne, #2 Declaration of Kent F. Larsen, #3 Notice Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Layne, Kendall) (Filed on 8/10/2021) Modified on 8/11/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/27/2021.]
August 6, 2021 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION HEARING. You are hereby notified that the hearing re #5 Motion to Dismiss is VACATED. The motion will be decided on the papers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/27/2021.]
July 29, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Audrey E Kramer. Smith Larsen & Wixom served on 7/19/2021, answer due 8/9/2021. PROOF OF EXECUTED SUMMONS WAS RECEIVED ON 07/29/2021 FROM PROCESS SERVER VIA EMAIL. (Kramer, Audrey) (Filed on 7/29/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/27/2021.]
July 29, 2021 Filing 9 REPLY (re #5 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byJPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Webb, Kristin) (Filed on 7/29/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/27/2021.]
July 27, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance of Aileen Marie Hunter as Counsel, filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Hunter, Aileen) (Filed on 7/27/2021) Modified on 7/28/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/27/2021.]
July 20, 2021 Filing 7 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #5 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byAudrey E Kramer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kramer, Audrey) (Filed on 7/20/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/27/2021.]
July 20, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Audrey E Kramer. Service waived by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. waiver sent on 6/7/2021, answer due 8/6/2021. Due date was actually 7/6/2021. (Kramer, Audrey) (Filed on 7/20/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/27/2021.]
July 8, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2021 01:30 PM before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 7/22/2021. Replies due by 7/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Proposed Order)(Webb, Kristin) (Filed on 7/8/2021) Modified on 7/9/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/27/2021.]
June 4, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Kent F. Larsen, Smith Larsen & Wixom. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/27/2021.]
June 3, 2021 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Audrey Kramer.. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/27/2021.]
June 3, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/9/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/16/2021 02:00 PM. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order for All Judges)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/27/2021.]
June 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Kent F. Larsen, Smith Larsen & Wixom (Filing fee $ 402.00. Receipt no. 44611017141). Filed by Audrey Kramer. (Attachments: #1 List of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibits D-F, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Filing Fee Receipt)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/27/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kramer v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey E Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.
Represented By: Aileen Marie Hunter
Represented By: Kristin Suzanne Webb
Represented By: Sean K. McElenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent F. Larsen
Represented By: Kendall Alexander Layne
Represented By: Marc S. Cwik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Larsen & Wixom
Represented By: Kendall Alexander Layne
Represented By: Marc S. Cwik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?