Adamian v. Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Plaintiff: Lora Adamian
Defendant: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Case Number: 2:2021cv01586
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/22/2021. By Judicial Assistant: E. Santiago. An Answer was filed in this case on September 3, 2021. A Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings was thereafter filed on September 17, 2021. No discovery plan and scheduling order or request to stay discovery was submitted by stipulation or motion despite the fact that a dispositive motion does not automatically stay discovery. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall either file a proposed discovery plan and scheduling order or a stipulation to stay discovery within ten (10) days of the date this Order. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES)
October 4, 2021 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to #6 Motion for Judgment by Defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Holmstrom, Kristina)
September 28, 2021 Filing 7 LETTER from Lora Adamian. (JQC)
September 17, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Judgment On The Pleadings by Defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. Responses due by 10/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of K. Holmstrom) (Holmstrom, Kristina)
September 13, 2021 Filing 5 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Holmstrom, Kristina)
September 3, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/18/2021.(Holmstrom, Kristina) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 27, 2021 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
August 27, 2021 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/27/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/11/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/26/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Las Vegas Justice Court, Case Number 21A001110, Dept. 6, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6612409) by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplement Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Holmstrom, Kristina) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 27, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (JQC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adamian v. Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lora Adamian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Represented By: Kristina N. Holmstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?