Ibuumerang, LLC v. T1 Payments LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ibuumerang, LLC
Defendant: Debra Karen King, T1 Payments LLC, T1 Payments Limited, Tglobal Services Limited, Donald Kasdon, Debra Karen Kasdon, Amber Fairchild, Payvision B.V., Pixxles, Ltd. and Cetler
Case Number: 2:2021cv01611
Filed: August 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ibuumerang, LLC re #4 Summons Issued. Payvision B.V. served on 10/21/2021. (Wellman, Scott)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by T1 Payments LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Kaplan, Kory)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss #9 Amended Complaint,, by Defendant T1 Payments LLC. Responses due by 11/8/2021. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit No 1 CPPA, #3 Exhibit No 2 EM General v. Electronic Commerce, #4 Exhibit No 3 FTC v Apex, #5 Exhibit FTC v. EM Systems) (Kaplan, Kory) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Party Cetler terminated re #8 . (JQC)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Amber Fairchild, Donald Kasdon, Debra Karen King, Payvision B.V., Pixxles, Ltd., T1 Payments LLC, T1 Payments Limited, Tglobal Services Limited by Ibuumerang, LLC. Removes parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - LinkedIn Screenshots, #2 Exhibit B - Website Shutdown, #3 Exhibit B1 - Notice of Closure, #4 Exhibit C - Visa Registry Search, #5 Exhibit D - Mastercard Registry List, #6 Exhibit E - LinkedIn Ads, #7 Exhibit F - Termination Notice) (Slighting, Bradley)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Ibuumerang, LLC. (Slighting, Bradley)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #6 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Scott Wellman and approving Designation of Local Counsel Bradley S Slighting. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/8/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Scott Wellman and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Bradley S. Slighting (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6617176) by Plaintiff Ibuumerang, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Standing) (Slighting, Bradley)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Scott Wellman to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/15/2021. (no image attached) (DKJ)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Cetler, Amber Fairchild, Donald Kasdon, Debra Karen King, Payvision B.V., Pixxles, Ltd., T1 Payments LLC, T1 Payments Limited, Tglobal Services Limited. (JQC)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES by Plaintiff Ibuumerang, LLC. (Slighting, Bradley)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ibuumerang, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Slighting, Bradley)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6615797) by Ibuumerang, LLC. Proof of service due by 11/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - LinkedIn Screenshots, #2 Exhibit B - Website Shutdown, #3 Exhibit B1 - Notice of Closure, #4 Exhibit C - Visa Registry Search Results, #5 Exhibit D - Mastercard Registry List, #6 Exhibit E - LinkedIn Ads, #7 Exhibit F - Termination Notice, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons Summonses) (Slighting, Bradley) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JQC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ibuumerang, LLC v. T1 Payments LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Karen King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T1 Payments LLC
Represented By: Kory Logan Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T1 Payments Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tglobal Services Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Kasdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Karen Kasdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber Fairchild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payvision B.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pixxles, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cetler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ibuumerang, LLC
Represented By: Scott Wellman
Represented By: Bradley S Slighting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?