Arney v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Desiree Ann Arney
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 2:2021cv01633
Filed: September 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Daniel P. Talbert on behalf of Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Talbert, Daniel)
September 17, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Certified Mail Return Receipts from Attorney General of the United States and the Social Security Administration #6 Summons and #5 Complaint. (HAM)
September 17, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #6 Summons Issued as to USA. USAO served on 9/15/2021. (MR) Modified service date on 9/17/2021 (SLD).
September 9, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Certified Mail Receipts to Attorney General of the United States and the Social Security Administration re #6 Summons Issued and #5 Complaint. (HAM)
September 3, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General re #5 Complaint. (HAM)
September 3, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi by Desiree Ann Arney. Proof of service due by 12/2/2021. (HAM)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court file the Complaint (ECF No. #1 -1) and serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by sending a copy of the summons and Complaint (ECF NO. #1 -1) by certified mail to: the Attorney General of the United States and the Social Security Administration. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court issue summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver the summons and Complaint (ECF NO. #1 -1) to the U.S. Marshal for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/3/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - certified mail of summons and complaint to AG and SSA and by email to USM - HAM)
September 2, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (DKJ)
September 2, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Desiree Ann Arney. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kalagian, Marc)
September 2, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Desiree Ann Arney. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons). (Kalagian, Marc)
September 2, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (DKJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arney v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desiree Ann Arney
Represented By: Leonard Stone
Represented By: Marc V Kalagian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Daniel P. Talbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?