Dieleman et al v. Cummings et al
Plaintiff: Michael Dieleman and Robert Dieleman
Defendant: John Cummings, Gretchen Smolka, Mark Peplowski and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2021cv01708
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: James C Mahan
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2410
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Filing 11 Joint STATUS REPORT CONCERNING REMOVAL by Plaintiffs Michael Dieleman, Robert Dieleman. (Schwarz, Joel)
October 8, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Dieleman, Robert Dieleman. John Cummings served on 8/19/2021. (Schwarz, Joel)
October 8, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Dieleman, Robert Dieleman. Gretchen Smolka served on 8/19/2021. (Schwarz, Joel)
October 8, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Dieleman, Robert Dieleman. Mark Peplowski served on 9/20/2021. (Schwarz, Joel)
October 7, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #4 , #5 , #6 Affidavits. The wrong event was selected. Counsel is advised to refile ECF No. #4 , #6 , #5 using the appropriate docket entry event, "Summons Returned Executed". (no image attached) (EDS)
October 7, 2021 Filing 6 ERROR: Incorrect event selected. Counsel advised to refile. AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and First Amended Complaint for Quiet Title Upon Gretchen Smolka, an Individual re #3 Statement in Removal Case by Plaintiffs Michael Dieleman, Robert Dieleman. (Schwarz, Joel)
October 7, 2021 Filing 5 ERROR: Incorrect event selected. Counsel advised to refile. AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and First Amended Complaint for Quiet Title Upon Gretchen Smolka, Special Administrator of The Estate of John Cummings re #3 Statement in Removal Case by Plaintiffs Michael Dieleman, Robert Dieleman. (Schwarz, Joel)
October 7, 2021 Filing 4 ERROR: Incorrect event selected. Counsel to refile. AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and First Amended Complaint for Quiet Title Upon Mark Peplowski re #3 Statement in Removal Case by Plaintiffs Michael Dieleman, Robert Dieleman. (Schwarz, Joel)
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant United States of America. (Stevko, Alexander)
September 16, 2021 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 9/16/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/1/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/16/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
September 16, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Clark County District Court, Case Number A-18-777754-C, by United States of America. Proof of service due by 11/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State court filings) (Stevko, Alexander) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 16, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (HAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dieleman et al v. Cummings et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dieleman
Represented By: Joel Schwartz
Represented By: Joel Z. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Dieleman
Represented By: Joel Schwartz
Represented By: Joel Z. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gretchen Smolka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Peplowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Alexander E. Stevko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?