Meraz v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Maria Wong Meraz
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 2:2021cv01771
Filed: September 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Returned/Executed Certified Mail Receipt from Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Region IX (SSA) re #7 Notice and #5 Order on Motion/Application by Maria Wong Meraz. (YAW)
September 30, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Certified Mail 7018 3090 0001 1133 3242 & 7018 3090 0001 1133 3235 re #5 Order. (JQC)
September 30, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (CC:USM,AG, SSA - JQC)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #1 Plaintiffs Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is GRANTED. See Order for Details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/30/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi by Maria Wong Meraz. Proof of service due by 12/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JQC)
September 27, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (DKJ)
September 27, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (DKJ)
September 24, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Maria Wong Meraz. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kalagian, Marc)
September 24, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Maria Wong Meraz. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) CONSENT to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. In accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. section 636(c), I voluntarily consent to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all further proceedings in this case, including entry of final judgment. I understand that appeal from the judgment shall be taken directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. (Kalagian, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meraz v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Wong Meraz
Represented By: Marc V Kalagian
Represented By: Leonard Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?