Landin v. Cardenas Markets, LLC
Plaintiff: Aurelio Infante Landin
Defendant: Cardenas Markets, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01815
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING #7 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall have the standard 180-day discovery plan, starting from September 7, 2021. The parties may seek extensions, if necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/15/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
November 12, 2021 Filing 7 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Cardenas Markets, LLC. (Maynarich, Ty)
October 28, 2021 Filing 6 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removed Action by Defendant Cardenas Markets, LLC. (Maynarich, Ty)
October 1, 2021 Case Reopened. Closed in error. (SLD)
September 30, 2021 ERROR: Entry entered in wrong case - disregard. Civil Case Administratively Closed. Opened in error. See correct case number 2:21-cv-01815-RFB-BNW. (SLD) Modified on 10/1/2021 (SLD).
September 30, 2021 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/30/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/15/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/30/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Cardenas Markets, LLC. Argonaut Great Central Insurance Company added. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Garasi, Anthony) Modified on 9/30/2021 to add Interested Party (SLD).
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Cardenas Markets, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit) (Garasi, Anthony)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-21-839736-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6649962) by Cardenas Markets, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Garasi, Anthony) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 30, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landin v. Cardenas Markets, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aurelio Infante Landin
Represented By: David Michael Moore
Represented By: Eric R. Blank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardenas Markets, LLC
Represented By: Anthony T. Garasi
Represented By: Madeline M. Arcellana
Represented By: Ty M Maynarich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?