Desirous Parties Unlimited Incorporated v. Right Connection Incorporated et al
Counter Defendant: Desirous Parties Unlimited Incorporated
Counter Claimant: Right Connection Incorporated and Don Hughes
Case Number: 2:2021cv01838
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ANSWER to #36 Counterclaim filed by Desirous Parties Unlimited Incorporated.(Sheik, Shahrokh)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Don Hughes, Right Connection Incorporated. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Goonan, Gregory)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 COUNTERCLAIM against Desirous Parties Unlimited Incorporated by Don Hughes, Right Connection Incorporated. (Goonan, Gregory)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Don Hughes.(Goonan, Gregory)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Right Connection Incorporated. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/27/2021.(Goonan, Gregory) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Desirous Parties Unlimited, Incorporated and by Defendants Don Hughes, Right Connection Incorporated. (Goonan, Gregory)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Desirous Parties Unlimited Incorporated re #6 Summons Issued,. (Singh, Charanjit)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #29 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Charanjit Singh and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Ben Lehavi. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/2/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #28 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Shahrokh Sheik and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Ben Lehavi. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/2/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Charanjit Singh and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Ben Lehavi (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6685574) by Plaintiff Desirous Parties Unlimited Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Lehavi, Ben)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Shahrokh Sheik and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Ben Lehavi (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6685565) by Plaintiff Desirous Parties Unlimited Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Lehavi, Ben)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/25/2021. Before the Court are the #20 Verified Petition to Practice Pro Hac Vice, filed by Shahrokh Sheik ("Sheik"), and the #21 Verified Petition to Practice Pro Hac Vice, filed by Charanjit Singh ("Singh"). On October 19, 2021, the Court notified Sheik and Singh (collectively, "Petitioners") that if they did not file corrected Verified Petitions by November 9, 2021, the Court would deny the #20 and #21 Verified Petitions. (See Min. Order, ECF No. 22 ). Petitioners refiled their Petitions; however, without Certificates of Good Standing from the highest admitting court in California or from the California State Bar, as is required under Local Rule IA 11-2(b)(3). Rather, it appears that Petitioners refiled their original Petitions. (See ECF Nos. #23 and #24 ). Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #20 Verified Petition and #21 Verified Petition are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that should Petitioners refile verified petitions, Petitioners are required to repay the filing fee. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NY)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #19 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Gregory P. Goonan and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Eric R. Olsen. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/20/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #19 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, for attorney Gregory P. Goonan, by Defendants Don Hughes, Right Connection Incorporated. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Olsen, Eric)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #21 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, for attorney Charanjit Singh, by Plaintiff Desirous Parties Unlimited Incorporated. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Lehavi, Ben)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #20 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, for attorney Shahrokh Sheik, by Plaintiff Desirous Parties Unlimited Incorporated. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Lehavi, Ben)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/19/2021. Before the Court is the #19 Verified Petition to Practice Pro Hac Vice, filed by Petitioner Gregory Goonan. Though the #19 Petition includes a Certificate of Good Standing from the State Bar of California, the Certificate was not issued "within six months before the date of filing of the verified petition," as is required by this District's Local Rule IA 11-2(b)(3). Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court DEFERS ruling on the #19 Petition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner Goonan shall have until November 9, 2021, file a corrected Verified Petition using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event that includes all applicable Certificates of Good Standing. Failure to timely remedy the deficiencies WILL result in the denial of the Verified Petition and petitioner's requirement to repay the filing fee.Also before the Court is the #20 Verified Petition to Practice Pro Hac Vice, filed by Shahrokh Sheik, and the #21 Verified Petition to Practice Pro Hac Vice, filed by Charanjit Singh. The #20 and #21 Petitions do not include Certificates of Good Standing from the highest admitting court of each state or state bar in which the applicant has been admitted to practice law, as required by this District's Local Rule IA 11-2(b)(3). Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court DEFERS ruling on the #20 and #21 Petitions. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioners Sheik and Singh shall have until November 9, 2021, file a corrected Verified Petition using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event that includes all applicable Certificates of Good Standing. Failure to timely remedy the deficiencies WILL result in the denial of the Verified Petitions and petitioners' requirement to repay the filing fee. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NY)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 View Corrected Image #25 as to MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Charanjit Singh and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Ben Lehavi (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6670305) by Plaintiff Desirous Parties Unlimited Incorporated. (Lehavi, Ben) Modified on 10/20/2021 (EDS).
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 View Corrected Image #23 as to MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Shahrokh Sheik and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Ben Lehavi (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6670278) by Plaintiff Desirous Parties Unlimited Incorporated. (Lehavi, Ben) Modified on 10/20/2021 (EDS).
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 View Corrected Image #24 as to MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Gregory P. Goonan and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Eric R. Olsen (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6669516) by Defendants Don Hughes, Right Connection Incorporated. (Olsen, Eric) Modified on 10/20/2021 (EDS).
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/5/2021. This action was received on* 10/5/2021* pursuant to a court order directing transfer from the* Arizona* and assigned case number 2:21-cv-01838-GMN-BNW. All future documents must bear said correct case number. Verified Petition due by 10/19/2021. Joint Status Report due by 11/4/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Charanjit Singh, Gregory Peter Goonan and Shahrokh Sheik to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 10/19/2021. (no image attached) (mailed 10/5/2021 - DRS)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AO 120 - REPORT on the TRANSFER of an action from the District of Arizona (3:21-cv-8177) to the District of Nevada regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (DRS)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 3:21-cv-08177. Original file with transfer order and docket sheet received. (DRS)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the parties' stipulation (Doc. #12 ) is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Nevada pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 10/4/2021. (LAD) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/5/2021.]
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (DRS)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the District of Nevada by Right Connection Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Goonan, Gregory) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/5/2021.]
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Gregory Peter Goonan on behalf of Defendants Don Hughes, Right Connection Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/5/2021.]
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Desirous Parties Unlimited Incorporated: Proof of Service re: Summons in a Civil Action; Complaint; Notice Of Availability Of A United States Magistrate Judge To Exercise Jurisdiction; Preliminary Order upon RIGHT CONNECTION, INC., a Nevada corporation on August 20, 2021. (Sheik, Shahrokh) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/5/2021.]
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant (s) and file a notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on November 9, 2021, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 8/13/21. (MAW) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/5/2021.]
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Desirous Parties Unlimited Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JAM) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/5/2021.]
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Don Hughes, Right Connection Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(JAM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. [Transferred from Arizona on 10/5/2021.]
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Shahrokh Sheik, Charanjit Singh on behalf of Plaintiff Desirous Parties Unlimited Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/5/2021.]
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Desirous Parties Unlimited Incorporated. (JAM) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/5/2021.]
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Desirous Parties Unlimited Incorporated. (JAM) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/5/2021.]
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(JAM) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/5/2021.]
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19753831. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-8177-PCT-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/5/2021.]
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Desirous Parties Unlimited Incorporated. (Sheik, Shahrokh) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(JAM) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/5/2021.]
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Desirous Parties Unlimited Incorporated. (JAM) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/5/2021.]
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19753831 filed by Desirous Parties Unlimited Incorporated. (Sheik, Shahrokh) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JAM) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/5/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Desirous Parties Unlimited Incorporated v. Right Connection Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Desirous Parties Unlimited Incorporated
Represented By: Charanjit Singh
Represented By: Shahrokh Sheik
Represented By: Ben Lehavi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Right Connection Incorporated
Represented By: Gregory Peter Goonan
Represented By: Eric R. Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Don Hughes
Represented By: Gregory Peter Goonan
Represented By: Eric R. Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?