Cooper v. Washington et al
Plaintiff: Maurice Donnell Cooper
Defendant: Alisha Washington, Chad Boardman, United States of America, Chad R. Boardman, United States Probation Office and Las Vegas Community Corrections Center (LVCC)
Case Number: 2:2021cv01847
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Richard F Boulware
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2021 Filing 27 RESPONSE to #23 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Plaintiff Maurice Donnell Cooper. Replies due by 12/9/2021. (YAW)
November 23, 2021 Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/23/2021. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #23 Motion to Dismiss,. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 22, 2021 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Defendant's #19 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Maurice Donnell Cooper. Replies due by 11/29/2021. (YAW) Modified text on 11/23/2021 (MR).
November 22, 2021 Filing 24 REPLY to Defendant's Opposition to #11 Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Maurice Donnell Cooper. (YAW)
November 22, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Las Vegas Community Corrections Center (LVCC), Alisha Washington. Responses due by 12/6/2021. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/6/2022. (Anderson, Lyssa) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
November 22, 2021 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Las Vegas Community Corrections Center (LVCC), Alisha Washington. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Anderson, Lyssa)
November 18, 2021 Filing 21 REPLY to Defendant's Opposition to #11 Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Maurice Donnell Cooper. (YAW) (Main Document 21 replaced on 11/18/2021) (DRS).
November 12, 2021 Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/12/2021. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #19 Motion to Dismiss. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
November 12, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Chad R. Boardman, United States of America. Responses due by 11/26/2021. (Pearson, Skyler)
November 12, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE to #11 Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Chad R. Boardman, United States of America. Replies due by 11/26/2021. (Pearson, Skyler)
November 10, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #11 Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Las Vegas Community Corrections Center (LVCC), Alisha Washington. Replies due by 11/24/2021. (Anderson, Lyssa)
November 3, 2021 Filing 15 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant United States of America. (Pearson, Skyler)
October 27, 2021 Filing 14 REPLY to #10 Statement in Removal Case by Plaintiff Maurice Donnell Cooper. (YAW)
October 22, 2021 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/22/2021. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #11 Motion for Summary Judgment. Opposition due 21 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due 14 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 21, 2021 Filing 12 Exhibit to #11 Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Maurice Donnell Cooper. (YAW) Modified on 10/22/2021 (EDS).
October 21, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Maurice Donnell Cooper. Responses due by 11/11/2021. (YAW)
October 21, 2021 Filing 10 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant United States of America. (Pearson, Skyler)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Las Vegas Community Corrections Center (LVCC) answer due 11/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/13/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
October 12, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Eighth Judicial District Court - Case Summary Report (Case No. A-21-839120-C) by Maurice Donnell Cooper. (YAW)
October 12, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants Las Vegas Community Corrections Center (LVCC), Alisha Washington. Responses due by 10/26/2021. (Anderson, Lyssa) Modified on 10/14/2021 (YAW).
October 12, 2021 Filing 6 JOINDER to #1 Petition for Removal, by Defendants Las Vegas Community Corrections Center (LVCC), Alisha Washington. (Anderson, Lyssa)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #2 Motion to Extend Time to Respond (First Request) re #1 Petition for Removal. Chad R. Boardman answer due 11/22/2021; Alisha Washington answer due 11/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/8/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
October 6, 2021 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
October 6, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/6/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/21/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 11/5/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
October 6, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (YAW)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Petition for Removal, by Defendant United States of America. (Pearson, Skyler)
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-21-839120-C, by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Summons and Complaint) (Pearson, Skyler) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Donnell Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alisha Washington
Represented By: Lyssa S Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Boardman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Skyler Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad R. Boardman
Represented By: Skyler Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Probation Office
Represented By: Skyler Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Community Corrections Center (LVCC)
Represented By: Lyssa S Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?