Sampson v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Stafford John Sampson
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv01921
Filed: October 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (HAM)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #16 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order; Discovery due by 6/16/2022. Motions due by 7/18/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/17/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 12/10/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
December 10, 2021 Filing 16 Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Insley-Micheri, Jennifer)
November 22, 2021 Filing 15 Joint STATUS REPORT in Removal Action by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Insley-Micheri, Jennifer)
November 22, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of 26(f) Case Conference by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Insley-Micheri, Jennifer)
November 22, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Stafford John Sampson. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Seegmiller, Clark)
November 1, 2021 Filing 12 EXHIBIT B - Corres re Stip to Amount to #11 Response, by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Insley-Micheri, Jennifer)
November 1, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #8 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Replies due by 11/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Pltff TLD, #2 Errata B- Corres re Stip, #3 Exhibit C - Corres re Decline, #4 Exhibit D - Pltff Complaint, #5 Exhibit E - Corres re Req for Records) (Insley-Micheri, Jennifer)
October 28, 2021 Filing 10 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Dennett, Ryan)
October 28, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jennifer Insley-Micheri on behalf of Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Insley-Micheri, Jennifer)
October 22, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Stafford John Sampson. Responses due by 11/5/2021. (Seegmiller, Clark)
October 21, 2021 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Dennett, Ryan)
October 21, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/5/2021.(Dennett, Ryan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 19, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #2 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Dennett, Ryan)
October 19, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Dennett, Ryan)
October 19, 2021 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 19, 2021 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/19/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 11/3/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 11/18/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 19, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from 8th Judicial District Court, Case Number A-21-841167-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6669376) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Dennett, Ryan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 19, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (JQC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sampson v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stafford John Sampson
Represented By: Clark Seegmiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Ryan L Dennett
Represented By: Jennifer Insley-Micheri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?