Medmarc Casualty Insurance Company v. Colquitt & Abbatangelo, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Medmarc Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Colquitt & Abbatangelo, Ltd., Ronald Colquitt, Anthony Abbatangelo, Robert T Barra, Donald Giebler and ABD Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01934
Filed: October 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Anthony Abbatangelo. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Whitmire, III, James)
December 1, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Anthony Abbatangelo. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/15/2022.(Whitmire, III, James) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Stipulation Re: #1 Complaint. Ronald Colquitt answer is due 12/17/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 11/16/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
November 16, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Plead to #1 Complaint, by Defendant Ronald Colquitt. (Colquitt, Ronald) Modified on 11/16/2021 to link document pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) (SLD).
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Stipulation Re: #1 Complaint. Anthony Abbatangelo answer due 12/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 11/15/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
November 12, 2021 Filing 7 First STIPULATION and Order Extending the Time for Defendant Anthony Abbatangelo to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Anthony Abbatangelo. (Whitmire, III, James)
November 11, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Medmarc Casualty Insurance Company re #4 Summons Issued. Ronald Colquitt served on 10/27/2021. (Thome, Sheri)
November 11, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Medmarc Casualty Insurance Company re #4 Summons Issued. Anthony Abbatangelo served on 10/27/2021. (Thome, Sheri)
October 20, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ABD Holdings, Inc., Anthony Abbatangelo, Robert T Barra, Ronald Colquitt, Colquitt & Abbatangelo, Ltd., Donald Giebler re #1 Complaint. (DRS)
October 20, 2021 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
October 20, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Medmarc Casualty Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Thome, Sheri)
October 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6671637) by Medmarc Casualty Insurance Company. Proof of service due by 1/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons to ABD Holdings, Inc., #4 Summons to Anthony Abbatangelo, #5 Summons to Colquitt & Abbatangelo, Ltd., #6 Summons to Donald Giebler, #7 Summons to Robert T. Barra, #8 Summons to Ronald Colquitt) (Thome, Sheri) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 20, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (DRS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medmarc Casualty Insurance Company v. Colquitt & Abbatangelo, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medmarc Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Sheri M. Thome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colquitt & Abbatangelo, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Colquitt
Represented By: Ronald Alan Colquitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Abbatangelo
Represented By: James E Whitmire, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert T Barra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Giebler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABD Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?