Braver v. HCSLV, Inc.
Plaintiff: Erin Braver
Defendant: HCSLV, Inc. and Orthopaedic Institute of Henderson
Case Number: 2:2021cv01959
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2021 Filing 10 Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Erin Braver. (Hatfield, Trevor)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation session. Pre-ENE Telephonic Conference set for 2/15/2022 at 03:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 2/16/2022 at 09:00 AM by videoconference before Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. Each party's written evaluation must be submitted electronically to judicial clerk Radia Amari at radia_amari@nvd.uscourts.gov, by 4:00 p.m. on February 8, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/29/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
November 23, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by HCSLV, Inc., Orthopaedic Institute of Henderson. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Stephens, David)
November 23, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by HCSLV, Inc., Orthopaedic Institute of Henderson. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/7/2022.(Stephens, David) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 28, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Erin Braver. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hatfield, Trevor)
October 26, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (MR) (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/26/2021) (MR).
October 26, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (MR)
October 26, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Erin Braver. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hatfield, Trevor)
October 26, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (MR)
October 25, 2021 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #1 . ERROR: It appears the complaint and the civil cover sheet are for a different case. Counsel is advised to file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #1 . (no image attached) (EDS)
October 25, 2021 Filing 1 View Corrected Image #3 as to COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6677297) by Erin Braver. Proof of service due by 1/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Hatfield, Trevor) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 10/26/2021 (EDS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braver v. HCSLV, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Braver
Represented By: Trevor J. Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCSLV, Inc.
Represented By: David A Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orthopaedic Institute of Henderson
Represented By: David A Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?