Holstein v. Transunion, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Holstein
Defendant: Transunion, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Avant, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv02199
Filed: December 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Extend Time - Transunion, LLC answer due 2/21/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/7/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
February 4, 2022 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) for Trans Union to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Transunion, LLC. (Bergh, Jennifer)
January 28, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement as to Avant, LLC by Daniel Holstein. (Tzall, Robert)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #5 Motion to Extend Time - Transunion, LLC answer due 2/7/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/6/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
January 6, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate Vantagescore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. added. (Gordon, Benjamin)
January 6, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 2/20/2022.(Gordon, Benjamin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
January 6, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Transunion, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holding, Inc. for Transunion, LLC added. (Bergh, Jennifer)
January 6, 2022 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) for Trans Union to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Transunion, LLC. (Bergh, Jennifer)
January 6, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jennifer Rebecca Bergh on behalf of Defendant Transunion, LLC. (Bergh, Jennifer)
December 14, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Avant, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Transunion, LLC re #1 Complaint. (DRS)
December 14, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Daniel Holstein. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Tzall, Robert)
December 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Avant, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Transunion, LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6731408) by Daniel Holstein. Proof of service due by 3/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons avant, #3 Summons experian, #4 Summons tu) (Tzall, Robert) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
December 14, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (DRS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holstein v. Transunion, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Holstein
Represented By: Robert M Tzall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transunion, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Rebecca Bergh
Represented By: Kurt R. Bonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Bradwell Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avant, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?