FaceTec, Inc. v. iProov Ltd.
Plaintiff: FaceTec, Inc.
Defendant: iProov Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2021cv02252
Filed: December 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2022 Filing 18 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against iProov Ltd. by FaceTec, Inc.. No changes to parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Austin, F.)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Nathaniel L. Dilger and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel F. Christopher Austin. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/31/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
January 28, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Nathaniel L. Dilger and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel F. Christopher Austin (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6777326) by Plaintiff FaceTec, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Austin, F.)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Stipulation to extend time to respond to the #1 Complaint; iProov Ltd. answer due 3/31/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/27/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant t o the NEF - HAM)
January 26, 2022 Filing 14 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Defendant iProov Ltd to Respond to #1 Complaint by Defendant iProov Ltd.. (Schuttert, Jay) Modified to add link on 1/26/2022 (MR).
January 26, 2022 Filing 13 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by iProov Ltd. on 1/24/2022 executed by iProov Ltd.. (Schuttert, Jay)
January 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #10 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for William J. O'Brien for FaceTec, Inc and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/16/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
January 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Peter R. Afrasiabi for FaceTec, Inc and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/16/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
January 14, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by William J. O'Brien and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel F. Christopher Austin (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6762101) by Plaintiff FaceTec, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Austin, F.)
January 14, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Peter R. Afrasiabi and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel F. Christopher Austin (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6762082) by Plaintiff FaceTec, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Austin, F.)
January 12, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by FaceTec, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Austin, F.)
December 29, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Nathaniel L. Dilger, Peter R. Afrasiabi, William J. OBrien to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 1/12/2022. (no image attached) (JQC)
December 29, 2021 Filing 6 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
December 29, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to iProov Ltd.. (JQC)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JQC)
December 29, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. Nature of Suit: 830/835 Patent Case (JQC)
December 28, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Defendant iProov LTD by Plaintiff FaceTec, Inc.. (Austin, F.)
December 28, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET to #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff FaceTec, Inc.. (Austin, F.)
December 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against iProov Ltd. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6744844) by FaceTec, Inc.. Proof of service due by 3/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Patent No. US 10,776,471 B2, #2 Exhibit B - Claim Chart for Patent No. 10,776,471 B2) (Austin, F.) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FaceTec, Inc. v. iProov Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FaceTec, Inc.
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Represented By: Nathaniel Dilger
Represented By: Peter Afrasiabi
Represented By: William J. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iProov Ltd.
Represented By: Jay Joseph Schuttert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?