Mitchell v. High Desert State Prison et al
Plaintiff: Deangelo Lamont Mitchell
Defendant: High Desert State Prison, Charles Daniels, Michael Minev, Roland Oliver, Jeremy Bean, Frank Dreesen, Ben Gutierrez, Nilo Peret, Sonya Carrillo, Doctor Bryan, Doctor Rivas, Doctor Hanf, Doctor Wilson and Jaymie
Interested Party: Office of the Attorney General (Nevada)
Case Number: 2:2022cv00236
Filed: February 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Chris William Davis on behalf of Defendants Jeremy Bean, Charles Daniels, Ben Gutierrez, Michael Minev, Nilo Peret. (Davis, Chris)
March 28, 2022 Filing 18 REPLY to Response (ECF No. #14 ) to ECF No. #9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Deangelo Lamont Mitchell. (HKL)
March 18, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Submission of Medical Records by Office of the Attorney General (Nevada) re #14 Response. (Taylor, Lorin)
March 18, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits in Camera and Under Seal re #14 Response by Interested Party Office of the Attorney General (Nevada). Responses due by 4/1/2022. (Taylor, Lorin)
March 18, 2022 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Interested Party Office of the Attorney General (Nevada). Replies due by 3/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2) (Taylor, Lorin)
March 18, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lorin Michelle Taylor on behalf of Interested Party Office of the Attorney General (Nevada). Regarding (4) Screening Order (Taylor, Lorin)
March 8, 2022 Filing 12 COMPLAINT against Jeremy Bean, Ben Gutierrez, Jaymie, Roland Oliver, Nilo Peret by Deangelo Lamont Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (JQC)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCREENING ORDER Denying #8 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Responses due by 3/18/2022 and Replies due by 3/25/2022. Re: #9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Attorney Generals Office will advise the Court by 3/18/2022 whether it can accept service for the named Defendants and enter a limited appearance for the purpose of responding to Mitchells injunctive- relief motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that given the nature of the claims that the Court has permitted to proceed, this action is STAYED for 90 days. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Attorney Generals Office will advise the Court by 3/29/2022 whether it will enter a limited notice of appearance on behalf of Defendants for the purpose of settlement. See Order for Details Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/8/2022. (copy of complaint sent to P)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
March 3, 2022 Filing 10 RECEIPT of Payment: $ 402.00, receipt number NVLAS079950. (JQC)
March 2, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, by Plaintiff Deangelo Lamont Mitchell. Responses due by 3/16/2022. (Image Identical to ECF No. #8 Motion.) (DRM)
March 2, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, by Plaintiff Deangelo Lamont Mitchell. (DRM)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part #6 Motion to Extend Time. Payment of filing fees or IFP due 5/11/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 2/17/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) Modified text on 2/22/2022 (SLD).
February 15, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Extend Time to pay initiating filing fee re ECF No. #5 Order, by Plaintiff Deangelo Lamont Mitchell. (HKL)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that on or before 4/11/2022, Plaintiff will either pay the full $402 filing fee for a civil action (which includes the $350 filing fee and the $52 administrative fee) or file with the Court: See Order for Details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 2/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Inmate IFP/Instructions) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF -cc: Prisoner IFP/Instructions sent to P - JQC)
February 7, 2022 Filing 4 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (Clerk's Note: This case was previously opened as 3:22-0067, but has been reassigned to the Southern District of Nevada and is now 2:22-cv-00236-GMN-BNW. Please use this case number on ALL future filings in your case. DRS)
February 7, 2022 Filing 3 CLERK NOTICE: This case was erroneously filed in the unofficial northern District of Nevada and is now being transferred to the unofficial southern District of Nevada and assigned case number 2:22-cv-00236 pursuant to LR IA 1-8. (WJ)
February 7, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (DRS)
February 3, 2022 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (HKL)
February 3, 2022 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Cover Sheet) (HKL)
February 3, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (WJ) Modified on 2/7/2022 Judge's assignments terminated 2/7/2022 re transfer to Southern Division. (WJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. High Desert State Prison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deangelo Lamont Mitchell
Represented By: HDSP Law Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Desert State Prison
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Daniels
Represented By: Chris William Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Minev
Represented By: Chris William Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roland Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Bean
Represented By: Chris William Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Dreesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Gutierrez
Represented By: Chris William Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nilo Peret
Represented By: Chris William Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonya Carrillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Hanf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaymie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of the Attorney General (Nevada)
Represented By: Lorin Michelle Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?