Malloy v. Amazon.Com Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Dwight Malloy
Defendant: AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC and Amazon.Com Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv00286
Filed: February 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Anne R Traum
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704 Labor Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2022 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to #22 Motion to Dismiss,, by Defendant Amazon.Com Services, LLC. (Paek, Montgomery)
May 23, 2022 Filing 23 RESPONSE to #22 Motion to Dismiss,, by Plaintiff Dwight Malloy. Replies due by 5/30/2022. (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Amazon Motion to Dismiss from Boone v. Amazon, #3 Exhibit Department of Labor Guidance, #4 Exhibit Nevada Attorney General Opinion Letter) (Foty, Don)
May 9, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss #20 Amended Complaint by Defendant Amazon.Com Services, LLC. Responses due by 5/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Emergency Regulations Issued by Nevada Department of Public Safety, #3 Exhibit B - April 14, 2020 Letter Issued by Nevada OSHA, #4 Exhibit C- Guidance on Preparing Workplaces for COVID-19, OSHA 3990-03 2020, #5 Exhibit D - Declaration of Emergency Directive #018, #6 Exhibit E - May 8, 2020 Letter Issued by Nevada OSHA, #7 Exhibit F - Nevada OSHA Sample Covid-19 Screening Questions for Employees, #8 Exhibit G - May 14, 2021 Letter Issued by Nevada OSHA) (Dickinson, Diana)
April 25, 2022 Filing 21 RESPONSE to #17 Motion to Dismiss,, by Plaintiff Dwight Malloy. Replies due by 5/2/2022. (Foty, Don)
April 25, 2022 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Amazon.Com Services, LLC by Dwight Malloy. No changes to parties. (Foty, Don)
April 13, 2022 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE that in order to create a caseload for U.S. District Judge Anne R. Traum, this case is reassigned to Judge Anne R. Traum for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:22-cv-00286-ART-VCF. (no image attached) (CJD)
April 11, 2022 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Amazon.Com Services, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Amazon.com Sales, Inc. for Amazon.Com Services, LLC added. (Dickinson, Diana)
April 11, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Defendant Amazon.Com Services, LLC. Responses due by 4/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - April 14, 2020 Letter Issued by Nevada OSHA, #3 Exhibit B - Guidance on Preparing Workplaces for COVID-19, OSHA, #4 Exhibit C - Declaration of Emergency Directive #018, #5 Exhibit D - May 8, 2020 Letter Issued by Nevada OSHA, #6 Exhibit E - Nevada OSHA Sample Covid-19 Screening Questions for Employees, #7 Exhibit F - May 14, 2021 Letter Issued by Nevada OSHA) (Dickinson, Diana)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting #7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice William M. Hogg and approving Designation of Local Counsel Esther C Rodriguez. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/3/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #14 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Amazon.Com Services, LLC answer due 4/11/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/3/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
March 3, 2022 Filing 14 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Amazon.Com Services, LLC. (Thompson, Amy)
March 2, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #7 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition for attorney William M. Hogg, by Plaintiff Dwight Malloy. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Rodriguez, Esther)
February 28, 2022 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/28/2022. Pending before the Court is Plaintiff Dwight Malloy's ("Plaintiff's") Motion to Extend Time for Petitioner William M. Hogg to provide a certificate of good standing from California for his #7 Verified Petition to Practice Pro Hac Vice, as required by the Court's 9 Minute Order. For good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's #11 Motion is GRANTED. Petitioner Hogg shall have until March 10, 2022, to file a corrected Verified Petition using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event that includes all applicable Certificates of Good Standing. Failure to timely remedy the deficiencies WILL result in the denial of the Verified Petition and Petitioner's requirement to repay the filing fee. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KB)
February 25, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to File Supplemental Pro Hac Vice Materials for William M. Hogg re 9 Minute Order,,, by Plaintiff Dwight Malloy. (Rodriguez, Esther)
February 24, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dwight Malloy re #6 Summons Issued. Amazon.Com Services, LLC served on 2/17/2022. (Foty, Don)
February 17, 2022 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/17/2022. Pending before the Court is the #7 Verified Petition to Practice Pro Hac Vice, filed by Petitioner William M. Hogg. The #7 Petition does not include Certificates of Good Standing from the highest admitting court of each state in which the applicant has been admitted to practice law, as required by this District's Local Rule IA 11-2(b)(3). Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court DEFERS ruling on the #7 Petition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner Hogg shall have until March 3, 2022, file a corrected Verified Petition using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event that includes all applicable Certificates of Good Standing. Failure to timely remedy the deficiencies WILL result in the denial of the Verified Petition and petitioner's requirement to repay the filing fee.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KB)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #3 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Don J. Foty and approving Designation of Local Counsel Esther C Rodriguez. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/17/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
February 16, 2022 Filing 7 View Corrected Image #13 as to MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by William M. Hogg and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Esther C. Rodriguez (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6800070) by Plaintiff Dwight Malloy. (Rodriguez, Esther) Modified on 3/2/2022 (EDS).
February 16, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amazon.Com Services, LLC. (JQC)
February 16, 2022 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
February 16, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel William M. Hogg to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 3/2/2022. (no image attached) (SLD)
February 16, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JQC)
February 15, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Don J. Foty and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Esther C. Rodriguez (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6798148) by Plaintiff Dwight Malloy. (Rodriguez, Esther)
February 15, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Dwight Malloy. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Rodriguez, Esther)
February 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6798033) by Dwight Malloy. Proof of service due by 5/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Rodriguez, Esther) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malloy v. Amazon.Com Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight Malloy
Represented By: Esther C Rodriguez
Represented By: William M. Hogg
Represented By: Don J. Foty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.Com Services, LLC
Represented By: Amy L Thompson
Represented By: Diana Dickinson
Represented By: Montgomery Y Paek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?