The Bank of New York Mellon v. Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: The Bank of New York Mellon
Defendant: Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company and Fidelity National Title Group, Inc
Case Number: 2:2022cv00341
Filed: February 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting #16 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company, Fidelity National Title Group, Inc answer due 5/23/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/22/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
April 21, 2022 Filing 16 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendants Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company, Fidelity National Title Group, Inc. (Sinclair, Kevin)
April 7, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (LOE)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #13 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 8/22/2022. Motions due by 9/21/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/21/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/7/2022.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
April 6, 2022 Filing 13 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff The Bank of New York Mellon. (Dragon, Lindsay)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #10 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company answer due 4/21/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/21/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
March 21, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Bank of New York Mellon. Fidelity National Title Group, Inc served on 3/9/2022. (Dragon, Lindsay)
March 20, 2022 Filing 10 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendants Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company, Fidelity National Title Group, Inc. (Sinclair, Kevin)
March 18, 2022 Filing 9 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company, Fidelity National Title Group, Inc. (Sinclair, Kevin)
March 8, 2022 Filing 8 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company, Fidelity National Title Group, Inc. (Sinclair, Kevin)
March 4, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Bank of New York Mellon. Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company served on 3/1/2022. (Dragon, Lindsay)
March 3, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company, Fidelity National Title Group, Inc that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Fidelity National Financial, Inc., Corporate Parent FNTG HOLDINGS, LLC for Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company, Fidelity National Title Group, Inc added. (Sinclair, Kevin)
March 3, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by The Bank of New York Mellon that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, Other Affiliate Mellon Financial Corporation, Other Affiliate The Bank of New York Company, Inc. for The Bank of New York Mellon added. (Dragon, Lindsay)
February 23, 2022 Filing 4 ERROR: Clerk's Office entered notice in error, document terminated. NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Kevin Samuel Sinclair to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 3/9/2022. (no image attached) (JQC)
February 23, 2022 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/23/2022. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/10/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 3/25/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
February 23, 2022 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
February 23, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District, Clark County, NV, Case Number A-22-848217-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6807081) by Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company. Proof of service due by 5/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint 1 of 2, #2 Exhibit Complaint 2 of 2, #3 Exhibit Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Gizer, Scott) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
February 23, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JQC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Bank of New York Mellon v. Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Represented By: Lindsay Dragon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin Samuel Sinclair
Represented By: Scott E Gizer
Represented By: Sophia Shunwan Lau
Represented By: Gary L. Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity National Title Group, Inc
Represented By: Kevin Samuel Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?