Valley Health System, LLC et al v. Travel Insurance Facilities, PLC et al
Plaintiff: Valley Health System, LLC, DVH Hospital Alliance LLC and Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC
Defendant: Travel Insurance Facilities, PLC and Union Reiseversicherung Aktiengesellschaft
Case Number: 2:2022cv00365
Filed: February 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Anne R Traum
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to Effectuate Service re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Plaintiffs DVH Hospital Alliance LLC, Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Valley Health System, LLC. (Wiley, Jason)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Timothy Maze Hartley and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jason M. Wiley (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-6869675) by Plaintiffs DVH Hospital Alliance LLC, Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Valley Health System, LLC. (Wiley, Jason)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE that in order to create a caseload for U.S. District Judge Anne R. Traum, this case is reassigned to Judge Anne R. Traum for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:22-cv-00365-ART-DJA. (no image attached) (AF)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removal by Defendants Travel Insurance Facilities, PLC, Union Reiseversicherung Aktiengesellschaft. (Aquino, Daniel)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Travel Insurance Facilities, PLC re #1 Petition for Removal. (KF)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Travel Insurance Facilities, PLC by Plaintiffs DVH Hospital Alliance LLC, Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Valley Health System, LLC. (Wiley, Jason)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (EDS)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Case to Magistrate Judge. (Document restricted under General Order 2021-03.)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #6 Motion to Extend Time to Comply with Deadline to File Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. Verified Petition due by 4/15/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 3/17/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Travel Insurance Facilities, PLC, Union Reiseversicherung Aktiengesellschaft. (Aquino, Daniel)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Case to Magistrate Judge. (Document restricted under General Order 2021-03.)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to Comply with Deadline to File Verified Petition and Designation of Counsel re 4 Notice for Desig of Local Counsel & VP,,, by Plaintiffs DVH Hospital Alliance LLC, Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Valley Health System, LLC. (Wiley, Jason)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 3/1/2022. By Deputy Clerk: K. Ferris. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/16/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 3/31/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) (Main Document 5 replaced on 3/1/2022) (KF). Regenerated NEF.
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Timothy M. Hartley to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 3/15/2022. (no image attached) (KF)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to General Order 2021-03. Attached is a form to indicate whether you consent or decline to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Please submit your consent or declination form within 21 days of filing your complaint or appearing as a defendant. See notice for details. Consent or declination is due by 3/21/2022. Please file the completed form under the filing event called Notice to Clerk - Consent or Declination in the Representation and Appearances civil menu category. (KF)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (KF)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Travel Insurance Facilities, PLC, Union Reiseversicherung Aktiengesellschaft that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Consal Beteiligungsgesellschaft AG, Other Affiliate Versicherungskammer Bayern Versicherungsanstalt des ffentlichen Rechts, Other Affiliate SV SparkassenVersicherung Lebensversicherung AG. for Union Reiseversicherung Aktiengesellschaft; Corporate Parent CSP Holding Limited for Travel Insurance Facilities, PLC added. (Aquino, Daniel)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-22-847419-B, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6812353) by Union Reiseversicherung Aktiengesellschaft, Travel Insurance Facilities, PLC. Proof of service due by 4/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Aquino, Daniel) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valley Health System, LLC et al v. Travel Insurance Facilities, PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valley Health System, LLC
Represented By: Jason M. Wiley
Represented By: Ryan Scott Petersen
Represented By: Timothy M. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DVH Hospital Alliance LLC
Represented By: Jason M. Wiley
Represented By: Ryan Scott Petersen
Represented By: Timothy M. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC
Represented By: Jason M. Wiley
Represented By: Ryan Scott Petersen
Represented By: Timothy M. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travel Insurance Facilities, PLC
Represented By: Daniel I. Aquino
Represented By: Patricia K Lundvall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Reiseversicherung Aktiengesellschaft
Represented By: Daniel I. Aquino
Represented By: Patricia K Lundvall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?