SFR Investments Pool 1 LLC, v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC, et al
Plaintiff: SFR Investments Pool 1 LLC,
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC doing business as Mr. Cooper and Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 2:2022cv00531
Filed: March 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting #16 Stipulation for Extension of Time, re #5 Motion for TRO, #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 6/1/2022. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/25/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
May 24, 2022 Filing 16 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) re #5 Motion for TRO and #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #5 Motion for TRO by Defendants Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Turley, Vanessa) Modified to add underlying motion(s) on 5/24/2022 (DRS).
April 29, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Vanessa M Turley on behalf of Defendants Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Turley, Vanessa)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #13 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: #5 Motion for TRO, #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Responses due by 5/4/2022. Nationstar Mortgage LLC answer due 5/4/2022. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/19/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
April 13, 2022 Filing 13 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) Extend Response Deadline and Vacate Hearing by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Wight, Brody)
April 6, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SFR Investments Pool 1 LLC,. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation served on 3/31/2022. (Schimming, Chantel)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #9 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: #5 Motion for TRO. Motion Hearing set for 4/28/2022 at 10:30 AM in LV Chambers - Videoconference before Judge Andrew P. Gordon. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/4/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
April 4, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SFR Investments Pool 1 LLC,. Nationstar Mortgage LLC served on 3/30/2022. (Schimming, Chantel)
April 4, 2022 Filing 9 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) and to Vacate Hearing re #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #5 Motion for TRO, #7 Order, by Plaintiff SFR Investments Pool 1 LLC,. (Schimming, Chantel)
March 30, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff SFR Investments Pool 1 LLC,. (Schimming, Chantel)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that defendants Nationstar Mortgage LLC and Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation have until noon on 4/4/2022 to file any response to the emergency motion for temporary restraining order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that I will conduct a video hearing on #5 the motion for a temporary restraining order on Tuesday, 4/5/2022, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/30/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
March 29, 2022 Filing 6 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff SFR Investments Pool 1 LLC,. Responses due by 4/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Schimming, Chantel)
March 29, 2022 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff SFR Investments Pool 1 LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Schimming, Chantel)
March 29, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by SFR Investments Pool 1 LLC, that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate SFR Investments, LLC, Other Affiliate SFR Funding, LLC, Other Affiliate Xiemen Limited Partnership, Other Affiliate Xiemen Investments, Ltd., Other Affiliate John Gibson for SFR Investments Pool 1 LLC, added. (Schimming, Chantel)
March 28, 2022 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
March 28, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (JQC)
March 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number CNVDC-6843940) by SFR Investments Pool 1 LLC,. Proof of service due by 6/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Schimming, Chantel) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
March 28, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JQC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SFR Investments Pool 1 LLC, v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SFR Investments Pool 1 LLC,
Represented By: Chantel Marie Schimming
Represented By: Karen L. Hanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC doing business as Mr. Cooper
Represented By: Vanessa M Turley
Represented By: Brody R. Wight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Vanessa M Turley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?