Porretti v. Daniels, et al.
Plaintiff: Wayne A Porretti
Defendant: Daniels, Nevada Prison Medical Director, Johnson and Ben (LNU)
Case Number: 2:2022cv00545
Filed: March 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Continuance on filing Informa Pauperis, re ECF No. #3 Order, by Plaintiff Wayne A Porretti. (DRM)
April 13, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE re ECF No. #3 by Wayne A Porretti. (HKL)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff a copy of the IFP application and instructions (attached within). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Plaintiff has until 6/3/2022 to either pay the $402 filing fee or file an IFP application with the Court. See Order for further details. If Plaintiff does not pay the filing fee or submit an IFP application to the Court by 6/3/2022, this case will be subject to Dismissal without Prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court will retain the complaint (ECF No.[1-1]) but will not file it at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 4/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application and Instructions - To be provided to Plaintiff through the Law Library)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
March 30, 2022 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (KF)
March 30, 2022 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (KF)
March 30, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (KF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porretti v. Daniels, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne A Porretti
Represented By: HDSP Law Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Prison Medical Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben (LNU)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?