Quezada v. Cardenas Markets, LLC
Plaintiff: Maria Quezada
Defendant: Cardenas Markets, LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv00681
Filed: April 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Cristina D Silva
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE for Citizenship of Members/Owners by Cardenas Markets, LLC. (Maynarich, Ty)
June 7, 2022 Filing 11 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removed Action by Defendant Cardenas Markets, LLC. (Maynarich, Ty)
May 19, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Maria Quezada. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Crafton, Brice)
May 5, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 1 Petition for Removal,, #5 Notice of Corrected Image/Document by Defendant Cardenas Markets, LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Maynarich, Ty)
May 4, 2022 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #5 and 1 . Counsel did not follow initial instruction at 4 which stated Include the Initiating Documents.... Counsel is advised to file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #5 , 1 . The document should include the Petition/Notice of Removal and the state court complaint(s) as attached at #5 . (no image attached) (DRS)
April 28, 2022 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 4/28/2022. Re: #2 Statement in Removal Case, On April 26, 2022, Defendants Cardenas Markets, LLC (Defendants) removed this action from the Eighth Judicial District Court for the State of Nevada to this Court based on diversity of citizenship between the parties pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332, 1441, and 1446. (Pet. Removal, ECF No. #5 ). To show Cardenas Markets, LLCs diversity from Plaintiff Maria Quezada, Defendants broadly state that Cardenas Markets, LLC is a citizen of Delaware. However, that broad statement fails to adequately allege Cardenas Markets, LLCs citizenship for purposes of diversity jurisdiction. See NewGen, LLC v. Safe Cig, LLC, 840 F.3d 606, 611 (9th Cir. 2016) (explaining that, to properly plead diversity jurisdiction for a limited liability company, the citizenship of all members must be pled). Accordingly, to ensure that the Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this case, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants must file a Notice, by June 10, 2022, listing the citizenship for all of the Cardenas Markets, LLCs members/owners. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JLB)
April 26, 2022 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 4/26/2022. Statement regarding removed action is due by 5/11/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/26/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
April 26, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 1 Petition for Removal, by Defendant Cardenas Markets, LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Maynarich, Ty)
April 26, 2022 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE. The State Court complaint is missing from the 1 Petition for Removal. Attorney Action Required. Counsel is advised to file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document include the Initiating documents and the state court complaint and link to 1 Petition of Removal. (no image attached) (DRS)
April 26, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Cardenas Markets, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Maynarich, Ty)
April 26, 2022 Filing 2 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Cardenas Markets, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Federal Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure, #4 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #5 Exhibit Notice of Appearance, #6 Exhibit Demand for Jury Trial, #7 Exhibit Answer to Amended Complaint) (Maynarich, Ty)
April 26, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (JQC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quezada v. Cardenas Markets, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Quezada
Represented By: Brice J Crafton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardenas Markets, LLC
Represented By: Anthony T. Garasi
Represented By: Ty M Maynarich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?