Houston v. Johnson et al
Petitioner: Matthew Travis Houston and Brick Houston
Respondent: Calvin Johnson and Sheriff Joe Lombardo
Case Number: 2:2022cv00693
Filed: April 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2022 Set/Clear Flags - RESTRICTED Flag added. No more documents to be filed in this case. (DRS)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Petitioner's Emergency Motion to Vacate Dismissal (ECF No. #12 ) is DENIED and his "Renewed Petition" (ECF No. #13 ) is STRUCK. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the Clerk of the Court is directed to ACCEPT NO FURTHER FILINGS IN THIS ACTION. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/6/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
June 3, 2022 Filing 13 2241 "RENEWED" Petition, DIRECT APPEAL, by Petitioner Matthew Travis Houston. Responses due by 6/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits (cont'd)) (DRM)
June 3, 2022 Filing 12 Emergency MOTION to Vacate Dismissal, by Petitioner Matthew Travis Houston. (DRM)
May 25, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE Emergency MOTION to Appear in Court, by Petitioner Matthew Travis Houston. (DRM) Modified on 5/25/2022 (AF).
May 25, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Deputy Attorney General on behalf of Respondents Calvin Johnson, Joe Lombardo. Deputy Attorney General Aaron D. Ford-AG terminated. (Hardcastle, Gerri)
May 23, 2022 Filing 9 CIVIL COVER SHEET and Exhibits, by Petitioner Matthew Travis Houston. (Case number from HDSP email subject line, and image last page.) (DRM)
May 23, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE MOTION re Emergency Grievance Form by Petitioner Matthew Travis Houston. Responses due by 6/6/2022. (HAM) Modified on 5/23/2022 (AF).
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion Requesting Case Numbers. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/23/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
May 17, 2022 Filing 6 USCA ORDER for Time Schedule as to #4 Notice of Appeal, filed by Matthew Travis Houston. USCA Case Number 22-15748. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
May 16, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION Requesting Missing Case Numbers by Petitioner Matthew Travis Houston. Responses due by 5/30/2022. (Image is duplicate of ECF No. #4 .) (CJD)
May 16, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEAL "and Letter of Motion to: Judges Jennifer A. Dorsey, Albregts and Navarro and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe as to ECF No. #3 Judgment re: ECF No. #2 Order Dismissing Case, by Petitioner Matthew Travis Houston. (Filing fee not paid.) E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (CJD)
May 2, 2022 Filing 3 JUDGMENT in favor of Calvin Johnson, Joe Lombardo against Matthew Travis Houston. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 5/2/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. ORDER denying #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/2/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - A. Ford added and #1 -1 regenerated to A. Ford - HAM)
April 25, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Matthew Travis Houston. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Notice of Change of Address) (HAM)
April 25, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (KF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houston v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Matthew Travis Houston
Represented By: HDSP Law Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brick Houston
Represented By: HDSP Law Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Calvin Johnson
Represented By: Gerri L Hardcastle
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sheriff Joe Lombardo
Represented By: Gerri L Hardcastle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?