Solomon v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Nebyou Solomon
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department and Sheriff Joseph Lombardo
Case Number: 2:2022cv00847
Filed: May 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #11 Stipulation to Extend LVMPD Defendants' Response to Amended Complaint. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department answer due 7/29/2022. Joseph Lombardo answer due 7/29/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 7/21/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
July 20, 2022 Filing 11 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) Stipulation and Order to Extend LVMPD Defendants Response to Amended Complaint (First Request) re #10 Amended Complaint by Defendants Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Joseph Lombardo. (Nichols, Jacqueline) (extend) (answer)
July 8, 2022 Filing 10 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Nebyou Solomon. No changes to parties. (Wolpert, Leo)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #8 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) to Amend Complaint or Oppose Defendants' Partial #4 Motion to Dismiss. Amended Complaint deadline: 7/8/2022. Responses due by 7/8/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 7/7/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
July 1, 2022 Filing 8 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Amend Complaint by Plaintiff Nebyou Solomon. (McLetchie, Margaret) Modified text on 7/7/2022 (EDS).
June 22, 2022 Filing 7 Filed to incorrect case in error. Disregard. Counsel shall refile in 22-cv-00867. CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Joseph Lombardo, Alfredo Quintero, Praveen Raj. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Nichols, Jacqueline) Modified on 6/22/2022 (DRS).
June 22, 2022 Filing 6 Filed to incorrect case in error. Disregard. Counsel shall refile in 22-cv-00867. MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Joseph Lombardo, Alfredo Quintero, Praveen Raj. Responses due by 7/6/2022. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/6/2022. (Nichols, Jacqueline) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 6/22/2022 (DRS).
June 17, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Joseph Lombardo. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Nichols, Jacqueline)
June 17, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Joseph Lombardo. Responses due by 7/1/2022. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/1/2022. (Nichols, Jacqueline) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 27, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Joseph Lombardo. (DRS)
May 27, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Nebyou Solomon. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Wolpert, Leo)
May 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-6919177) by Nebyou Solomon. Proof of service due by 8/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Proposed Summons to Defendant Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, #3 Summons Proposed Summons to Defendant Sheriff Joseph Lombardo) (Wolpert, Leo) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 27, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (DRS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solomon v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nebyou Solomon
Represented By: Leo S Wolpert
Represented By: Margaret A McLetchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Represented By: Jacqueline Victoria Nichols
Represented By: Nicholas Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Joseph Lombardo
Represented By: Jacqueline Victoria Nichols
Represented By: Nicholas Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?