Thomas et al v. Clark County et al
Plaintiff: Daichena Thomas, Dana Thomas, Devontay Thomas, Delon Armstrong, Johntae Williams and Germaine Carmena
Defendant: Clark County, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Clark County Detention Center, Wellpath, LLC, Correct Care Solutions, LLC, J. Marcos, Earl D. Salviejo, Tanja Wasielewski, H. Taddeo, Ace T., Lars Williams, H. Hannash, David Oliphant, Alexia, Becky S. Christensen, Ray Martin Montenegro and Kate Purcell
Case Number: 2:2022cv00899
Filed: June 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (LOE)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting #15 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 6/12/2023. Motions due by 7/10/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/7/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/3/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Daichena Thomas, Dana Thomas, Devontay Thomas.. (Stovall, Leslie)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. To date, the parties have not filed a stipulated discovery plan as required by Local Rule 26- 1(a). The parties are hereby ORDERED to file, no later than August 8, 2022, a joint proposed discovery plan. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/8/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/1/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department.. (Daniels, Ryan)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JOINDER to #11 Statement in Removal Case by Defendant Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. (Anderson, Lyssa)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Wellpath, LLC. (Vogel, Stephen)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. (Anderson, Lyssa)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Anderson, Lyssa)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department.(Anderson, Lyssa)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Alexia, Becky S. Christensen, Correct Care Solutions, LLC, H. Hannash, J. Marcos, Ray Martin Montenegro, David Oliphant, Kate Purcell, Earl D. Salviejo, Ace T., H. Taddeo, Tanja Wasielewski, Wellpath, LLC, Lars Williams. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 7/28/2022.(Jordan, Erin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/6/2022. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/21/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 7/6/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1331, 1441, 1442 AND 1446 by Becky S. Christensen, Correct Care Solutions, LLC, H. Hannash, LPN Alexia, J. Marcos, Ray Martin Montenegro, David Oliphant, Kate Purcell, Earl D. Salviejo, Ace T., H. Taddeo, Tanja Wasielewski, Wellpath, LLC, Lars Williams re #1 Petition for Removal,,. (Vogel, Stephen)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Becky S. Christensen, Correct Care Solutions, LLC, H. Hannash, LPN Alexia, J. Marcos, Ray Martin Montenegro, David Oliphant, Kate Purcell, Earl D. Salviejo, Ace T., H. Taddeo, Tanja Wasielewski, Wellpath, LLC, Lars Williams. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Vogel, Stephen)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendants Becky S. Christensen, Correct Care Solutions, LLC, H. Hannash, LPN Alexia, J. Marcos, Ray Martin Montenegro, David Oliphant, Kate Purcell, Earl D. Salviejo, Ace T., H. Taddeo, Tanja Wasielewski, Wellpath, LLC, Lars Williams. (Vogel, Stephen)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court Clark County, Case Number A-22-851935-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-6928991) by Correct Care Solutions, LLC, Becky S. Christensen, Lars Williams, Ray Martin Montenegro, H. Hannash, Ace T., Earl D. Salviejo, Kate Purcell, J. Marcos, LPN Alexia, H. Taddeo, Tanja Wasielewski, David Oliphant, Wellpath, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Vogel, Stephen) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas et al v. Clark County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daichena Thomas
Represented By: Leslie M Stovall
Represented By: Ross Heber Moynihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Thomas
Represented By: Leslie M Stovall
Represented By: Ross Heber Moynihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devontay Thomas
Represented By: Leslie M Stovall
Represented By: Ross Heber Moynihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delon Armstrong
Represented By: Leslie M Stovall
Represented By: Ross Heber Moynihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johntae Williams
Represented By: Leslie M Stovall
Represented By: Ross Heber Moynihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Germaine Carmena
Represented By: Leslie M Stovall
Represented By: Ross Heber Moynihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Represented By: Lyssa S Anderson
Represented By: Ryan W. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellpath, LLC
Represented By: Erin E. Jordan
Represented By: Stephen B Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Erin E. Jordan
Represented By: Stephen B Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Marcos
Represented By: Erin E. Jordan
Represented By: Stephen B Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl D. Salviejo
Represented By: Erin E. Jordan
Represented By: Stephen B Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanja Wasielewski
Represented By: Erin E. Jordan
Represented By: Stephen B Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Taddeo
Represented By: Erin E. Jordan
Represented By: Stephen B Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace T.
Represented By: Erin E. Jordan
Represented By: Stephen B Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lars Williams
Represented By: Erin E. Jordan
Represented By: Stephen B Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Hannash
Represented By: Erin E. Jordan
Represented By: Stephen B Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Oliphant
Represented By: Erin E. Jordan
Represented By: Stephen B Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexia
Represented By: Erin E. Jordan
Represented By: Stephen B Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becky S. Christensen
Represented By: Erin E. Jordan
Represented By: Stephen B Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Martin Montenegro
Represented By: Erin E. Jordan
Represented By: Stephen B Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kate Purcell
Represented By: Erin E. Jordan
Represented By: Stephen B Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?