Lopez v. Bed Bath & Beyond Inc.
Plaintiff: Florencia Lopez
Defendant: Bed Bath & Beyond Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv00915
Filed: June 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2022 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (KF)
August 2, 2022 Filing 14 ERROR: Document terminated - assigned to EJY in error. CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (KF) Modified on 8/2/2022 (SLD).
August 2, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (KF)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #11 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 1/3/2023. Motions due by 2/2/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/6/2023. Pursuant to LR 16-6(b), this action must be assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/2/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
August 1, 2022 Filing 11 Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Florencia Lopez.. (Neal, Victoria)
July 7, 2022 Filing 10 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Bed Bath & Beyond Inc... (Sliker, Joshua)
June 22, 2022 Filing 9 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Bed Bath & Beyond Inc.. (Brady, Katlyn)
June 17, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Bed Bath & Beyond Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/1/2022.(Sliker, Joshua) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #6 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Answer #1 Petition. Bed Bath & Beyond Inc. answer due 6/17/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/14/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
June 13, 2022 Filing 6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Bed Bath & Beyond Inc.. (Sliker, Joshua)
June 7, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Florencia Lopez. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Neal, Victoria)
June 7, 2022 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/7/2022. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/22/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 7/7/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
June 7, 2022 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
June 7, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Bed Bath & Beyond Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Sliker, Joshua)
June 7, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-22-849611-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-6931151) by Bed Bath & Beyond Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sliker, Joshua) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
June 7, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (DRS)
June 7, 2022 Attorney update in case due to counsel's entry error: Attorney Katlyn M Brady for Bed Bath & Beyond Inc. and James P. Kemp for Florencia Lopez added. (Deadline for Cert. of IP tracking date terminated - DRS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Bed Bath & Beyond Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florencia Lopez
Represented By: James P. Kemp
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bed Bath & Beyond Inc.
Represented By: Joshua A Sliker
Represented By: Katlyn M Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?