Lykins et al v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Peter Lykins and Maria Lykins
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department and Dori Koren
Case Number: 2:2022cv01068
Filed: July 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #16 Stipulation to Extend LVMPD Defendants Reply re #10 Response to #6 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/8/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 8, 2022 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to #6 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Dori Koren, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. (Nichols, Jacqueline)
August 5, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (HAM)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #12 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order; Discovery due by 3/21/2023. Motions due by 4/20/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/20/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 8/5/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 5, 2022 Filing 16 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) and Order to Extend LVMPD Defendants Reply in Support of #6 Motion to Dismiss. by Defendants Dori Koren, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. (Nichols, Jacqueline) (extend) (sumjgm) Modified to link to underlying motion on 8/9/2022 (EDS).
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #14 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Reply re #6 Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 8/5/2022. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/4/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
August 3, 2022 Filing 14 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) Stipulation and Order to Extend LVMPD Defendants Reply in Support of Motion for Partial Dismissal (First Request) re #10 Response to #6 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Dori Koren, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. (Nichols, Jacqueline) (extend) (sumjgm) Modified to link to underlying motion on 8/4/2022 (EDS).
August 3, 2022 Filing 13 Joint STATUS REPORT Post Removal by Plaintiffs Maria Lykins, Peter Lykins.. (Rasmussen, Lisa)
August 3, 2022 Filing 12 Amended Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Maria Lykins, Peter Lykins.. (Rasmussen, Lisa)
August 3, 2022 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Maria Lykins, Peter Lykins that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Rasmussen, Lisa)
July 27, 2022 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #6 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Maria Lykins, Peter Lykins. Replies due by 8/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Original exhibits filed with state court amended complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Interrogatories to Metro served on July 8, 2022, #3 Exhibit 3 - July 21, 2021 Order Accepting Certified Questions, Directing Briefing, and Directing Submission of Filing Fee. Nevada Supreme Court Case No. 81513, #4 Exhibit 4 - ACLU Petition Adverse LVMPD to the Department of Justice, as referenced in Cepero v. Gillespie, No. 211CV01421JADNJK, 2020 WL 6173503, at *9 n.116 (D. Nev. Oct. 21, 2020), #5 Exhibit 5 - November 15, 2021, Amended Complaint, Downes-Covington v. LVMPD, U.S. District Court, District of Nevada, Case No. 2:20-cv-01790-CDS-DJA, ECF No. 56)(Rasmussen, Lisa)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that ECF No. #8 is DENIED. The parties have not demonstrated good cause for the lengthy discovery period they seek. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must file a new proposed discovery plan and scheduling order by 7/29/2022 and may seek up to 240 days for discovery. The parties may seek discovery extensions later, if necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/26/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
July 25, 2022 Filing 8 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Maria Lykins, Peter Lykins.. (Rasmussen, Lisa)
July 21, 2022 Filing 7 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Dori Koren, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department.. (Nichols, Jacqueline)
July 13, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Dori Koren, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. by Defendants Dori Koren, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. Responses due by 7/27/2022. (Nichols, Jacqueline)
July 11, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #3 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendants Dori Koren, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department.. (Nichols, Jacqueline)
July 6, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Dori Koren, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Nichols, Jacqueline)
July 6, 2022 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/6/2022. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/21/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/5/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 6, 2022 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 6, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-22-853246-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-6963441) by Dori Koren, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Nichols, Jacqueline) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 6, 2022 Attorney update in case: Attorney Craig R. Anderson added for Defendants and Attorneys Lisa A Rasmussen and Richard Lafayette Bryant added for Plaintiffs as listed on the #1 Petition for Removal and #1 -3 State Court Complaint. (SLD)
July 6, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lykins et al v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Lykins
Represented By: Lisa A Rasmussen
Represented By: Richard Lafayette Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Lykins
Represented By: Lisa A Rasmussen
Represented By: Richard Lafayette Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Represented By: Craig R. Anderson
Represented By: Jacqueline Victoria Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dori Koren
Represented By: Craig R. Anderson
Represented By: Jacqueline Victoria Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?