Rogers v. Backgroundchecks.com LLC
Plaintiff: Kimberly Rogers
Defendant: Backgroundchecks.com LLC and Backgroundchecks.com, LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv01102
Filed: July 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2022 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/17/2022. Before the Court is the #7 Notice of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Rogers ("Plaintiff") representing that Plaintiff and Defendant Backgroundchecks.com, LLC ("Defendant") are in the process of finalizing a settlement. (See Notice Settlement 2:1-2, ECF No. #7 ). Plaintiff and Defendant expect to submit dismissal documents within sixty (60) days. (Id. 2:2-4). Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff and Defendant shall file dismissal documents no later than October 17, 2022, or else a joint status report informing the Court of the status of settlement.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that in light of Plaintiff and Defendant's settlement, all currently pending deadlines between Plaintiff and Defendant are VACATED.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EH)
August 17, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of settlement between Plaintiff and Backgroundchecks.com LLC by Kimberly Rogers re #1 Complaint,.. (Haines, George)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #5 Stipulation to Extend Time (First Request) to File Responsive Pleading re #1 Complaint. Backgroundchecks.com LLC answer due 9/2/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 8/1/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
August 1, 2022 Filing 5 STIPULATION MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to File Responsive Pleading re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Backgroundchecks.com LLC. Responses due by 8/15/2022. (Dickinson, Diana) (answer) Modified on 8/1/2022 (DRS).
July 12, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Backgroundchecks.com LLC re #1 Complaint. (SLD)
July 12, 2022 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 11, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (SLD)
July 11, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Kimberly Rogers. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kind, Michael)
July 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Backgroundchecks.com LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-6969307) by Kimberly Rogers. Proof of service due by 10/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Kind, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. Backgroundchecks.com LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Rogers
Represented By: George Haines
Represented By: Gerardo Avalos
Represented By: Michael Kind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Backgroundchecks.com LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Backgroundchecks.com, LLC
Represented By: Diana Dickinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?