Nevada Restaurant Services, Inc. v. Factory Mutual Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Nevada Restaurant Services, Inc. dba Dotty's and Nevada Restaurant Services, Inc. doing business as Dotty's
Defendant: Factory Mutual Insurance Company, Affiliated FM Insurance Company, Jefferey Zebarth, Patrick Langin and Factory Mutual Insurance Company doing business as FM Global
Case Number: 2:2022cv01104
Filed: July 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 635 Breach of Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 REPLY to Response to #21 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Nevada Restaurant Services, Inc.. (Jones, J.)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting #36 Stipulation to stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/31/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 First STIPULATION TO STAY DISCOVERY by Defendants Affiliated FM Insurance Company, Patrick Langin, Jefferey Zebarth. (Russell, Howard) (stay) (nondispositive)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 REPLY to Response to #9 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants Affiliated FM Insurance Company, Patrick Langin, Jefferey Zebarth. (Russell, Howard)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 REPLY to Response to #10 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants Affiliated FM Insurance Company, Patrick Langin, Jefferey Zebarth. (Russell, Howard)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 RESPONSE to #21 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendant Affiliated FM Insurance Company. Replies due by 8/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Russell, Howard)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting #29 Stipulation to Dismiss Defendant Factory Mutual Insurance Company without prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/22/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting #22 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Shant A. Karnikian and approving Designation of Local Counsel as to Randall Jones. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/22/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting #23 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gary C. Partamian for Plaintiff, Nevada Restaurant Services, Inc. dba Dotty's, and approving Designation of Local Counsel for J. Randall Jones. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/22/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION TO DISMISS Stipulation and Order to Dismiss Defendant Factory Mutual Insurance Company Without Prejudice by Plaintiff Nevada Restaurant Services, Inc.. (Florance, Madison) (dismiss)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting #25 Stipulation for extension of time to file response to #8 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 8/19/2022. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/16/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Attorney update in case: Attorney Mona Kaveh for added for Plaintiff Nevada Restaurant Services, Inc. as listed on the #25 Stipulation. (SLD)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 RESPONSE to #10 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Nevada Restaurant Services, Inc.. Replies due by 8/22/2022. (Jones, J.)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RESPONSE to #9 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Nevada Restaurant Services, Inc.. Replies due by 8/22/2022. (Jones, J.)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) TO FILE OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FACTORY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S #8 MOTION TO DISMISS re #20 Order, by Plaintiff Nevada Restaurant Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jones, J.) (extend) (answer) Modified on 8/16/2022 to relink document. (SLD)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Affiliated FM Insurance Company, Factory Mutual Insurance Company, Patrick Langin, Jefferey Zebarth.. (Russell, Howard)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by GARY C. PARTAMIAN and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel J. RANDALL JONES (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7007498) by Plaintiff Nevada Restaurant Services, Inc.. (Jones, J.)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by SHANT A. KARNIKIAN and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel J. RANDALL JONES (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7007482) by Plaintiff Nevada Restaurant Services, Inc.. (Jones, J.)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Nevada Restaurant Services, Inc.. Responses due by 8/24/2022. (Jones, J.)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting #19 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: #8 , #9 , and #10 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 8/15/2022. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/29/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS re #9 Motion to Dismiss, #10 Motion to Dismiss, #8 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Nevada Restaurant Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jones, J.) (extend) (answer)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Affiliated FM Insurance Company, Factory Mutual Insurance Company.. (Russell, Howard)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting #14 Stipulation and Order for Continuance of Court Deadlines (First Request). Verified Petition/Designation of Local Counsel due by 8/25/2022. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/25/2022.; Attorney Brian S. Kabateck terminated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting #13 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christina M Lincoln for Affiliated FM Insurance Company, Factory Mutual Insurance Company, Patrick Langin, and Jefferey Zebarth and approving Designation of Local Counsel as to Howard J. Russell. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/22/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #12 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Amy M Churan for Affiliated FM Insurance Company, Factory Mutual Insurance Company, Patrick Langin, and Jefferey Zebarth and approving Designation of Local Counsel Howard J. Russell. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/22/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE (First Request) STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE OF COURT DEADLINES (FIRST REQUEST) by Plaintiff Nevada Restaurant Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jones, J.) (continue) (trial)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 First MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Christina M. Lincoln and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Howard J. Russell (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-6983628) by Defendants Affiliated FM Insurance Company, Factory Mutual Insurance Company, Patrick Langin, Jefferey Zebarth. (Russell, Howard)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 First MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Amy M. Churan and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Howard J. Russell (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-6983604) by Defendants Affiliated FM Insurance Company, Factory Mutual Insurance Company, Patrick Langin, Jefferey Zebarth. (Russell, Howard)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Patrick Langin, Jefferey Zebarth that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent FMIC Holdings, Inc. for Jefferey Zebarth, Patrick Langin added.. (Russell, Howard)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Patrick Langin. Responses due by 8/1/2022. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/1/2022. (Russell, Howard) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Jefferey Zebarth. Responses due by 8/1/2022. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/1/2022. (Russell, Howard) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Factory Mutual Insurance Company. Responses due by 8/1/2022. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/1/2022. (Russell, Howard) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Affiliated FM Insurance Company's ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Affiliated FM Insurance Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/1/2022.(Russell, Howard) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Howard J. Russell on behalf of Defendants Patrick Langin, Jefferey Zebarth. (Russell, Howard)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/12/2022. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/27/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/11/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Brian S. Kabateck, Gary Partamian, Shant Karnikian, Amy M Churan, Christina M Lincoln, to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the PACER website www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 7/26/2022. (no image attached) (EDS)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (EDS)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Factory Mutual Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Russell, Howard)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 First PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District, Case Number A-22-853365-B, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-6969371) by Factory Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12) (Russell, Howard) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nevada Restaurant Services, Inc. v. Factory Mutual Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nevada Restaurant Services, Inc. dba Dotty's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nevada Restaurant Services, Inc. doing business as Dotty's
Represented By: J. Randall Jones
Represented By: Madison S. Florance
Represented By: Mona Kaveh
Represented By: Brian S. Kabateck
Represented By: Gary C. Partamian
Represented By: Shant A. Karnikian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Factory Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Howard J. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affiliated FM Insurance Company
Represented By: Amy M Churan
Represented By: Christina M Lincoln
Represented By: Ryan T. Gormley
Represented By: Howard J. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferey Zebarth
Represented By: Amy M Churan
Represented By: Christina M Lincoln
Represented By: Howard J. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Langin
Represented By: Amy M Churan
Represented By: Christina M Lincoln
Represented By: Howard J. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Factory Mutual Insurance Company doing business as FM Global
Represented By: Amy M Churan
Represented By: Christina M Lincoln
Represented By: Ryan T. Gormley
Represented By: Howard J. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?