Devlin v. Aon Risk Insurance Services West, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Michael Devlin
Defendant: Aon Risk Insurance Services West, Inc. and Allstate Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2022cv01145
Filed: July 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2022 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company.. (Weinerman, Deleela)
August 11, 2022 Party Aon Risk Insurance Services West, Inc. terminated per #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (KF)
August 10, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Allstate Insurance Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/24/2022.(Weinerman, Deleela) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 10, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice, by Plaintiff Joseph Michael Devlin. . (Courtney, John)
July 19, 2022 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/19/2022. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/3/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/18/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
July 18, 2022 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
July 18, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (KF)
July 18, 2022 Filing 3 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Weinerman, Deleela)
July 18, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Allstate Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Weinerman, Deleela)
July 18, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-22-849149-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-6977367) by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Weinerman, Deleela) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Devlin v. Aon Risk Insurance Services West, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Michael Devlin
Represented By: Andrew P. Dunning
Represented By: John C. Courtney
Represented By: Sebastian Felipe Gajardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aon Risk Insurance Services West, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Deleela M. Ivey Weinerman
Represented By: Jared G Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?