Howe v. GEICO Advantage Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Adam Howe
Defendant: GEICO Advantage Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2022cv01171
Filed: July 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Anne R Traum
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (HKL)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER granting ECF No. #8 Stipulation. Discovery due by 2/16/2023. Motions due by 3/18/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/17/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 8/22/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HKL)
August 19, 2022 Filing 8 STIPULATION Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant GEICO Advantage Insurance Company. (Miller, Lara) (other) (discovery)
August 18, 2022 Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant GEICO Advantage Insurance Company.. (Miller, Lara)
August 10, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Adam Howe. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Wilson, Justin)
August 1, 2022 Filing 5 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant GEICO Advantage Insurance Company.. (Miller, Lara)
July 21, 2022 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable District Judge Anne R. Traum on 7/21/2022. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/5/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/20/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 21, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by GEICO Advantage Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Miller, Lara)
July 21, 2022 Filing 2 Defendant's ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal, and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by GEICO Advantage Insurance Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/4/2022.(Miller, Lara) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 21, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-22-854382-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-6981069) by GEICO Advantage Insurance Company. (Miller, Lara) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 21, 2022 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Anne R. Traum and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (JQC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howe v. GEICO Advantage Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Howe
Represented By: Justin L Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Advantage Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew John Douglas
Represented By: Thomas E. Winner
Represented By: Lara L. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?