Bailey v. Henderson Police Department, et al.
Plaintiff: Michael Bailey
Defendant: City of Henderson, Nevada, Henderson Police Department, Thedrick Andres, City of Henderson Police Department, Dustin Erickson, Marcus McCrary, Luke Good, City of Las Vegas, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department and Sheriff Joe Lombardo
Case Number: 2:2022cv01211
Filed: July 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cristina D Silva
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #5 Stipulation that Plaintiff may serve process on all Henderson Defendants by emailing the Summons and Complaint to Brian R. Reeve, counsel for the Henderson Defendants. That Plaintiff will grant the Henderson Defendants a 60-day extension of time from the date process is served to file a response to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 8/29/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION and Order by Defendant City of Henderson, Nevada. (Reeve, Brian) (other) (answer)
August 9, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Thedrick Andres, City of Henderson Police Department, City of Henderson, Nevada, City of Las Vegas, Dustin Erickson, Luke Good, Henderson Police Department, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Marcus McCrary, Sheriff Joe Lombardo. (JQC)
August 9, 2022 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Michael Bailey. (Attachments: #1 Summons Henderson Police Dept, #2 Summons Officer Erickson, #3 Summons Officer Good, #4 Summons Chief Thedrick Andres, Henderson Police Dept, #5 Summons Sheriff Joe Lombardo, #6 Summons City of Las Vegas, #7 Summons Officer McCrary, #8 Summons Las Vegas Metropolitan Polide Dept.)(Hatfield, Trevor)
July 28, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Michael Bailey. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hatfield, Trevor)
July 28, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (JQC)
July 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-6988997) by Michael Bailey. Proof of service due by 10/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hatfield, Trevor) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. Henderson Police Department, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bailey
Represented By: Trevor J. Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Henderson, Nevada
Represented By: Brian R. Reeve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henderson Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thedrick Andres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Henderson Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus McCrary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke Good
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Las Vegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Joe Lombardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?